This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 09:43:39 (UTC).

LCG 1 CHAPEL AVE LLC et al v. THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS' ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 LCG 1 CHAPEL AVE LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS' ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and Kevin McNulty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00426

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANCE LUCARELLI

LCG 1 CHAPEL AVE LLC

Defendants

THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS' ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA

PGA TOUR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC D'ANGIOLILLO

Attorney at RIKER DANZIG

One Speedwell Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07962

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY JOSEPH DREYER

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Request for Issuance of Summons

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Update - The document #9 Stipulation filed by PGA TOUR, INC. submitted by PGA TOUR, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/26/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint is extended to March 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/3/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by PGA TOUR, INC.. (DREYER, ANTHONY) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PGA TOUR, INC.. (DREYER, ANTHONY) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY JOSEPH DREYER on behalf of PGA TOUR, INC. (DREYER, ANTHONY) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LCG 1 CHAPEL AVE LLC, LANCE LUCARELLI. PGA TOUR, INC. served on 2/15/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to PGA TOUR, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against PGA TOUR, INC., filed by LCG 1 CHAPEL AVE LLC, LANCE LUCARELLI. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance of Summons)(D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS' ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketJudge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LCG 1 CHAPEL AVE LLC. (D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS' ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11947244) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LCG 1 CHAPEL AVE LLC, LANCE LUCARELLI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(D'ANGIOLILLO, MARC) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PROFESSIONAL GOLFERS' ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where PGA TOUR INC A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony J. Dreyer