This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2020 at 09:46:02 (UTC).

Lay v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Lay filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Caesars Entertainment Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah K. Chasanow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02674

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah K. Chasanow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Anthony Lay

Defendant

Caesars Entertainment Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Leigh Hebb

Attorney at Semmes Bowen and Semmes PC

25 S Charles St Ste 1400

Baltimore, MD 21201

Richard J. Medoff

Attorney at Semmes, Bowen & Semmes

25 South Charles Street, Suite 1400

Baltimore, MD 21201

Maurice Belmont VerStandig

Attorney at The VerStandig Law Firm, LLC

9812 Falls Road, #114-160

Potomac, MD 20854

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #7 Consent/Joint MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/21/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Hebb, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars Entertainment Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment, Inc. for Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Hebb, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/17/2020. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent/Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Robert Anthony Lay (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Adverse Party by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 103.5 Certificate by Caesars Entertainment Corporation (slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/17/2020 (slss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

4 #1

Attachment to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

2 #2

Lower Court Docket Sheet

2 #1

Lower Court Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Caesars Entertainment Corporation, filed by Robert Anthony Lay. (Attachments: #1 Lower Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Lower Court Docket Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #2

Clerk Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-20-003055. ( Filing fee paid check #24337 $ 400), filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #2 Clerk Letter) (slss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Electronically Transferred to the USDC for the District of Nevada, Northern Division (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400, receipt number 14637124708 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Consent/Joint MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/21/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Hebb, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Caesars Entertainment Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment, Inc. for Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(Hebb, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/17/2020. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDeficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/22/2020 (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent/Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Robert Anthony Lay (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Adverse Party by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 103.5 Certificate by Caesars Entertainment Corporation (slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/17/2020 (slss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketThe above documents #2 through #4 are copies of filings in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Caesars Entertainment Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 60 days as to Caesars Entertainment Corporation.(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Caesars Entertainment Corporation, filed by Robert Anthony Lay. (Attachments: #1 Lower Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Lower Court Docket Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-20-003055. ( Filing fee paid check #24337 $ 400), filed by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #2 Clerk Letter) (slss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less