This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:12:34 (UTC).

LAWSON v. HOLLAND et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2019 LAWSON filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against HOLLAND. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAKISHA LAWSON

Defendants

HEATH HOLLAND

BRIAN EUSTICE

CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC

L POOLE

NAFEESHA SCOTT

TIMOTHY DUNAWAY

ROBIN TIDWELL

JANNA BLANKS

TRENTON CARTER

HILTON HATCHER

KENNETH BARBER

DUSTIN JORDAN

CENTURION LLC

JEFFREY HOLDEN

RONALD MUNYAK

JASON BARWICK

MARGARET RALLS

VICTORIA CLARK

CENTURION MANAGED CARE OF FLORIDA LLC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIXIE DAN POWELL

Attorney at POWELL POWELL & POWELL - CRESTVIEW FL

602 South Main Street

Crestiview, FL 32536

Defendant Attorneys

JEFFREY SCOTT HOWELL

Attorney at JEFFREY S HOWELL PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

2898-6 Mahan Drive

Tallahassee, FL 32308

ROBERT CRAIG MAYFIELD

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT ETC LLP - TAMPA FL

100 N Tampa Street, Ste 2200

Tampa, FL 33602

MARY ANN COUCH

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT ETC - BIRMINGHAM AL

1819 5Th Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #29 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/6/2020. Discovery due by 3/15/2020. Mediation to take place by 4/13/2020. Mediation Report due by 4/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#33

(#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. L POOLE served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#32

(#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. HILTON HATCHER served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#31

(#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. KENNETH BARBER served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#30

(#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. JEFFREY HOLDEN served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#29

(#29) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MAKISHA LAWSON (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#27

(#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. VICTORIA CLARK served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

3 #10

Summons

3 #9

Summons

3 #8

Summons

3 #6

Summons

3 #5

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Order Appointing Personal Representative and Letters of Administration

#1

ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (jcw) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #29 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/6/2020. Discovery due by 3/15/2020. Mediation to take place by 4/13/2020. Mediation Report due by 4/27/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. L POOLE served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. HILTON HATCHER served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. KENNETH BARBER served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. JEFFREY HOLDEN served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #29 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (sdw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MAKISHA LAWSON (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. VICTORIA CLARK served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. JANNA BLANKS served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. CENTURION MANAGED CARE OF FLORIDA LLC served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKISHA LAWSON. CENTURION LLC served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sdw) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Issuance of Summons by MAKISHA LAWSON (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons) (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (jcw) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4444282.), filed by MAKISHA LAWSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Appointing Personal Representative and Letters of Administration) (POWELL, DIXIE) (Entered: 03/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion of Florida is a litigant