This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:43:39 (UTC).

Lawson v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Lawson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephanie Lawson

ALL PLAINTIFFS

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander Dwyer

Attorney at Kirkendall Dwyer LLP

440 Louisiana, Ste. 1901

Houston, TX 77002

Brett A. Emison

Attorney at Langdon & Emison

911 Main Street, P.O. Box 220

Lexington, MO 64067

 

Court Documents

#7660

No Description Available

#14

(#14) ORDER NO. 167: Regarding Procedures and Schedule for Wave Four Targeted Discovery and Motion Practice and Additional Wave Pools to Address Remaining Personal Injury Claims -- Given the remarkable success of the "wave" process in this multidistrict litigation ("MDL") to date, the Court agrees with New GM that a Wave Four should be adopted to address the remaining personal injury and wrongful death claims (many of which were filed after the previous waves were adopted) and any new claims filed in the future. For good cause shown, the Court thus adopts the following schedule and procedures for Wave Four discovery of and motion practice regarding the remaining personal injury and wrongful death cases, as well any new claims that may be filed and consolidated going forward. That said, the Court is sympathetic to Lead Counsel's concerns regarding claims that have been pending in this MDL for a significant amount of time. See ECF No. 7783, at 3. To help ensure that such claims are advanced more quickly, with an eye toward settlement or remand, the Court would be open to adopting more "aggressive" procedures claims that were initially filed before January 1, 2017 (i.e., the first seven claims listed in ECF No. 7783-2), including but not limited to perhaps allowing "bilateral fact and expert discovery" for such claims. Id. at 5. Lead Counsel and counsel for New GM shall meet and confer to discuss the issue and, no later than March 13, 2020, submit an agreed-upon proposed order with respect to these claims or competing orders and letter briefs. Unless and until the Court adopts additional or different procedures for such claims, they shall be subject to the schedule and procedures set forth herein. (SEE ORDER.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/4/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (ab) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#9

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has considered L&E's remaining arguments and finds them to be without merit. Accordingly, L&E's motion is DENIED, without prejudice to renewal after resolution of the Pending Motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/19/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (jca) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#5

(#7) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (6 in 1:20-cv-00094-JMF, 7 in 1:19-cv-11898-JMF, 7678 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 7 in 1:19-cv-11900-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00104-JMF, 4 in 1:19-cv-11922-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00096-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00092-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00101-JMF) Letter filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this in the cases listed in Exhibit 1, but is directed not to close those cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/16/2020) (ama) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#15

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: On February 6, 2020, Langdon & Emison filed a notice of appeal from the Court's Order of November 8, 2019. See ECF No. 7712. If any party believes the notice of appeal moots or otherwise has bearing on the pending motion for certification pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), see ECF No. 7683, it shall advise the Court by letter no later than February 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/7/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (yv) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#4

(#6) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Andrew B. Bloomer, P.C. dated January 15, 2020 re: Dismissal of Economic Loss Claims in Newly Consolidated Cases Pursuant to Order No. 50. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-md-02543. Document filed by Stephanie Lawson.(Dwyer, Alexander) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alexander Dwyer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect Courthouse Assignment code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

7703 #1

Exhibit 1

10 #2

Exhibit B

14 #63

(#8) MOTION for Judgment Motion for Certification Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) and Entry of Final Judgment Under FRCP 58. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to General Motors LLC. Document filed by Stephanie Lawson. (Dwyer, Alexander) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

14 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel

#15

(#15) NOTICE of 33 Plaintiffs Eligible to Participate in Wave Four Targeted Discovery, Pursuant to Order No. 167. Document filed by General Motors LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al..(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

10 #7768

(#13) NOTICE of Overdue Discovery Pursuant to Order No. 25. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al..(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of 33 Plaintiffs Eligible to Participate in Wave Four Targeted Discovery, Pursuant to Order No. 167. Document filed by General Motors LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al..(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER NO. 167: Regarding Procedures and Schedule for Wave Four Targeted Discovery and Motion Practice and Additional Wave Pools to Address Remaining Personal Injury Claims -- Given the remarkable success of the "wave" process in this multidistrict litigation ("MDL") to date, the Court agrees with New GM that a Wave Four should be adopted to address the remaining personal injury and wrongful death claims (many of which were filed after the previous waves were adopted) and any new claims filed in the future. For good cause shown, the Court thus adopts the following schedule and procedures for Wave Four discovery of and motion practice regarding the remaining personal injury and wrongful death cases, as well any new claims that may be filed and consolidated going forward. That said, the Court is sympathetic to Lead Counsel's concerns regarding claims that have been pending in this MDL for a significant amount of time. See ECF No. 7783, at 3. To help ensure that such claims are advanced more quickly, with an eye toward settlement or remand, the Court would be open to adopting more "aggressive" procedures claims that were initially filed before January 1, 2017 (i.e., the first seven claims listed in ECF No. 7783-2), including but not limited to perhaps allowing "bilateral fact and expert discovery" for such claims. Id. at 5. Lead Counsel and counsel for New GM shall meet and confer to discuss the issue and, no later than March 13, 2020, submit an agreed-upon proposed order with respect to these claims or competing orders and letter briefs. Unless and until the Court adopts additional or different procedures for such claims, they shall be subject to the schedule and procedures set forth herein. (SEE ORDER.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/4/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (ab) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Overdue Discovery Pursuant to Order No. 25. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al..(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has considered L&E's remaining arguments and finds them to be without merit. Accordingly, L&E's motion is DENIED, without prejudice to renewal after resolution of the Pending Motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/19/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (jca) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: On February 6, 2020, Langdon & Emison filed a notice of appeal from the Court's Order of November 8, 2019. See ECF No. 7712. If any party believes the notice of appeal moots or otherwise has bearing on the pending motion for certification pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), see ECF No. 7683, it shall advise the Court by letter no later than February 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/7/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (yv) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Affected Plaintiffs on January 31, 2020. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al..(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Any party that objects to the motion for certification and entry of a final judgment filed by Langdon & Emison LLC, 14-MD-2543, ECF No. 7683, shall file a letter advising the Court of the intent to file an opposition no later than January 24, 2020. The formal opposition itself shall be filed no later than February 4, 2020. Any reply shall be filed no later than February 11, 2020. If no party files a letter by January 24, 2020, the Court will treat the motion as unopposed. Langdon & Emison incorrectly filed its motion in every single member case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all motions filed in member cases on January 20, 2020, but to leave to leave the motion filed on the main docket (14-MD-2543, ECF No. 7683) active. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 2/4/2020 Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/21/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(ama) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Judgment Motion for Certification Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) and Entry of Final Judgment Under FRCP 58. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Emison, Brett) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (6 in 1:20-cv-00094-JMF, 7 in 1:19-cv-11898-JMF, 7678 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 7 in 1:19-cv-11900-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00104-JMF, 4 in 1:19-cv-11922-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00096-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00092-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00101-JMF) Letter filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this in the cases listed in Exhibit 1, but is directed not to close those cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/16/2020) (ama) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Andrew B. Bloomer, P.C. dated January 15, 2020 re: Dismissal of Economic Loss Claims in Newly Consolidated Cases Pursuant to Order No. 50. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 14-md-2543. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Dwyer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Alexander Dwyer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect Courthouse Assignment code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to General Motors LLC. Document filed by Stephanie Lawson. (Dwyer, Alexander) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-md-02543. Document filed by Stephanie Lawson.(Dwyer, Alexander) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dwyer, Alexander) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18430372)Document filed by Stephanie Lawson.(Dwyer, Alexander) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.