This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:55:53 (UTC).

Lawrence v. Sony Pictures Entertainment Incorporated

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Lawrence filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sony Pictures Entertainment Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01785

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamella Lawrence

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant

Sony Pictures Entertainment Incorporated

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint #1 , with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint no later than October 15, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint by October 15, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/30/2020. (REK) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#4

(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01785-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE (Order/Referral to ADR) by Pamella Lawrence. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pamella Lawrence. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Part 6

1 #4

Part 5

1 #3

Part 4

1 #2

Part 3

1 #1

Part 2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pamella Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #6 Order, Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint #1 , with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint no later than October 15, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint by October 15, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/30/2020. (REK) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01785-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE (Order/Referral to ADR) by Pamella Lawrence. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pamella Lawrence. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pamella Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less