This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2020 at 07:49:38 (UTC).

Lawrence v. LNU

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Lawrence filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against LNU. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew J. Kacsmaryk and Lee Ann Reno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew J. Kacsmaryk

Referral Judge

Lee Ann Reno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryant Lawrence

Amarillo, TX 79107

Respondent

FNU LNU

 

Court Documents

6 #1

General Order Concerning Litigation

#6

(#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (awc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Western, Austin Division; Case Number 1:20-cv-00860. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Amarillo Division of the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Opening Letter mailed to Bryant Lawrence. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 is DUE.), filed by Bryant Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. (Copy of NEF showing transfer of case also mailed to plaintiff.) Wed Aug 19 11:37:26 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (awc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Western, Austin Division; Case Number 1:20-cv-00860. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Amarillo Division of the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Opening Letter mailed to Bryant Lawrence. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 is DUE.), filed by Bryant Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less