This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 07:25:38 (UTC).

LAWRENCE v. HAYDAROV

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 LAWRENCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAYDAROV. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01749

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LATASHA J. LAWRENCE

Defendant

MURODJON HAYDAROV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON I. MANUS

Attorney at KWARTLER MANUS LLC

1429 Walnut Street, Suite 701

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

DAVID G. VOLK

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER PC

450 Sentry Pkwy Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF LATASHA J. LAWRENCE'S MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED. THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/3/21. 5/3/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PCCP.(JL ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by LATASHA J. LAWRENCE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(MANUS, JASON) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#2

(#2) STIPULATION to cap damages at $75,000.00 by LATASHA J. LAWRENCE. (MANUS, JASON) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

1 #7

Case Management Track Form

1 #6

Designation Form

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MURODJON HAYDAROV (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15055087), filed by MURODJON HAYDAROV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Designation Form, #7 Case Management Track Form)(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal state court record, along with certified copy of Order dated 5/3/2021, mailed to the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County by Certified Mail on 6/7/2021. (md, ) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketPLEADING #5 MAILED TO PCCP (JL ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF LATASHA J. LAWRENCE'S MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED. THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 5/3/21. 5/3/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PCCP.(JL ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (fdc, ) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by LATASHA J. LAWRENCE.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(MANUS, JASON) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STIPULATION to cap damages at $75,000.00 by LATASHA J. LAWRENCE. (MANUS, JASON) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Eligible for Arbitration(fb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by MURODJON HAYDAROV, LATASHA J. LAWRENCE. (fb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MURODJON HAYDAROV (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15055087), filed by MURODJON HAYDAROV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Designation Form, #7 Case Management Track Form)(VOLK, DAVID) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID G. VOLK