This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 08:41:07 (UTC).

LAWRENCE et al v GERBER BABY PRODUCTS

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 LAWRENCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GERBER BABY PRODUCTS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Mark Falk. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-13676

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERIK LAWRENCE

RACHEL M. FRANTZ

MARIE MEZILE

Defendant

GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLAS A. ABRAHAMS

Attorney at KOHN, SWIFT, & GRAF, PC

1600 Market Street, Suite 2500

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7225

Defendant Attorneys

GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road, 2Nd Floor

Parsippany, NJ 07054

GLENN T. GRAHAM

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

One Jefferson Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit A: Master File No. 2:21-cv-01977-CCC-MF, Dkt. No. 40

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; the above-captioned action is consolidated with the Consolidated Action (2:21-cv-01977-CCC-MF) and is deemed a "Related Action" for purposes of the Consolidation Order (Consolidated Action Dkt. No. 40). etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/10/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Geoffrey W. Castello requesting a consolidation of actions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Master File No. 2:21-cv-01977-CCC-MF, Dkt. No. 40, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to William E. Hoese on 7/21/2021 by RACHEL M. FRANTZ, ERIK LAWRENCE, MARIE MEZILE. Waiver of Service due by 9/20/2021. (ABRAHAMS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN T. GRAHAM on behalf of GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY (GRAHAM, GLENN) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY W. CASTELLO, III on behalf of GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY (CASTELLO, GEOFFREY) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS A. ABRAHAMS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ABRAHAMS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (ps) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GERBER PRODUCTS COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12633209) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ERIK LAWRENCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ABRAHAMS, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gerber Products Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey W. Castello

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenn T. Graham