This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 15:04:17 (UTC).

LAWRENCE v. CRYOUSA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 LAWRENCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CRYOUSA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and Kevin McNulty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14251

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLEEN LAWRENCE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

CRYOCENTRAL, LLC

CRIOMED LTD D/B/A/ SPACE CABIN

CRYOUSA, LLC

JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 -10

ABC CORPORATION 1 - 10

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant

CRYOUSA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS T. SMITH

Attorney at PASHMAN STEIN, PC

21 Main Street, Suite 100

Hackensack, NJ 07601-7054

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorneys

DAVID S. OSTERMAN

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA

301 Carnegie Center Drive, Suite 200

Princeton, NJ 08540

THADDEUS JOSEPH HUBERT, IV

Attorney at HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST AND DOUKAS

40 Paterson Street, P.O. Box 480

New Burnswick, NJ 08903

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH DEDONATO

Attorney at MORGAN MELHUISH ABRUTYN

651 W. Mt. Pleasant Avenue, Suite 200

Livingston, NJ 07039

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Third Party ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CRYOCENTRAL, LLC.(DEDONATO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRYOCENTRAL, LLC. (DEDONATO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint , ANSWER to Crossclaim by CRYOCENTRAL, LLC.(DEDONATO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#12

(#12) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/25/2019. (seb) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRYOCENTRAL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#10

(#10) Request for Summons to be Issued by CRYOUSA, LLC as to CRYOCENTRAL, LLC. (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRIOMED LTD D/B/A/ SPACE CABIN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#8

(#8) Request for Summons to be Issued by COLLEEN LAWRENCE as to CRIOMED LTD D/B/A/ SPACE CABIN. (SMITH, DENNIS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#7

(#7) Exhibit to #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim by CRYOUSA, LLC. (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CRYOCENTRAL, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against CRYOCENTRAL, LLC, CRIOMED LTD D/B/A/ SPACE CABIN by CRYOUSA, LLC. (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by THADDEUS JOSEPH HUBERT, IV on behalf of CRYOUSA, LLC (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

4 #1

Cover Letter

#4

(#4) Notice of Removal filed in Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County from David S. Osterman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(sm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to CRYOUSA, LLC.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRYOUSA, LLC identifying CRYOUSA HOLDINGS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRYOUSA, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-3944-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9770547), filed by CRYOUSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Third Party ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CRYOCENTRAL, LLC.(DEDONATO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Note - Please disregard docket No. #13 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, ANSWER to Crossclaim, Attorney will refile. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRYOCENTRAL, LLC. (DEDONATO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint , ANSWER to Crossclaim by CRYOCENTRAL, LLC.(DEDONATO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/25/2019. (seb) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRYOCENTRAL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Request for Summons to be Issued by CRYOUSA, LLC as to CRYOCENTRAL, LLC. (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRIOMED LTD D/B/A/ SPACE CABIN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Summons to be Issued by COLLEEN LAWRENCE as to CRIOMED LTD D/B/A/ SPACE CABIN. (SMITH, DENNIS) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Exhibit to #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim by CRYOUSA, LLC. (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CRYOCENTRAL, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against CRYOCENTRAL, LLC, CRIOMED LTD D/B/A/ SPACE CABIN by CRYOUSA, LLC. (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by THADDEUS JOSEPH HUBERT, IV on behalf of CRYOUSA, LLC (HUBERT, THADDEUS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CRYOUSA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/17/2019. (th, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Removal filed in Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County from David S. Osterman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(sm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to CRYOUSA, LLC.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRYOUSA, LLC identifying CRYOUSA HOLDINGS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRYOUSA, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-3944-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9770547), filed by CRYOUSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(OSTERMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Scott Osterman