This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2020 at 11:18:33 (UTC).

Thompson v. Fleet Parts & Service, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Fleet Parts Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01824

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence M. Thompson

Defendants

Meritor, Inc.

Fleet Parts & Service, Inc.

Dexter Axle Company

Ford Motor Company

Konecranes, Inc.

H-E Parts International, Inc.

Morse TEC, LLC

Kelsey-Hayes Company

Rockwell Automation, Inc.

Pneumo Abex Corp.

General Electric Company

Genuine Parts Company

Honeywell International, Inc.

Schneider Electric USA, Inc.

Navistar, Inc.

Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc.

LBCE Holdings, Inc.

Northwest Crane Service, LLC

Caterpillar, Inc.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mickey P. Landry

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Matthew C. Clark

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jeffrey A. O'Connell

Attorney at Nemeroff Law Firm (Dallas)

12720 Hillcrest Rd., Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75230

Philip C Hoffman

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Frank J. Swarr

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Barrett Naman

Attorney at Nemeroff Law Firm (Houston)

3355 West Alabama Street

Houston, TX 77098

Other Attorneys

William Claudy Harrison, Jr.

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Amber B. Barlow

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan, LLP

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer E. Adams

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

8 #1

Transmittal Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/13/2020.(cwa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #1 Transmittal Letter) (cwa). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document Notice of Removal by DCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, William) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Pneumo Abex Corporation (Harrison, William) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by DCo LLC (Harrison, William) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Pneumo Abex Corporation.Attorney William Claudy Harrison, Jr added to party Pneumo Abex Corporation(pty:dft).(Harrison, William) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by DCo LLC. (pp) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th Judicial District Court for the Parish of Pla, case number 66-120 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8375555) filed by DCo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney William Claudy Harrison, Jr added to party Dana Companies, LLC(pty:dft).(Harrison, William) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (pp). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LBCE Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEXTER AXLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MERITOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where P&H MINING EQUIPMENT INC. is a litigant