This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2020 at 07:13:42 (UTC).

Stan Lawrence et al v. Colin Quinn et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Stan Lawrence filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Colin Quinn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10012

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lawrence Int'l Corp.

Stan Lawrence

Defendants

Colin Quinn

CQE, Inc.

DOES 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald N Richards

Attorney at Law Offices of Ronald Richards and Associates APC

P O Box 11480

Beverly Hills, CA 90213

Defendant Attorneys

Edwin F McPherson

Attorney at McPherson LLP

1801 Century Park East 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Pierre B Pine

Attorney at McPherson LLP

1801 Century Park East 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2326

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Order GRANTING THE STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO FURTHER EXTEND THE TIM

#13

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order GRANTING THE STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO FURTHER EXTEND THE TIM

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

SUMMONS

1 #1

COMPLAINT

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 27, 2020 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants CQE, Inc., Colin Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING THE STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO FURTHER EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING NOTICE - The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 2/3/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING THE STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO FURTHER EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including January 13, 2020 to file and serve their response to Plaintiffs Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 13, 2020 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants CQE, Inc., Colin Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING THE STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES TO FURTHER EXTEND THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 1/13/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CQE, Inc. answer now due 12/30/2019; Colin Quinn answer now due 12/30/2019, filed by Defendants CQE, Inc.; Colin Quinn.(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Stan Lawrence, Lawrence Int'l Corp. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/17/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CQE, Inc., Colin Quinn, OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on 11-22-2019. (McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CQE, Inc., Colin Quinn. (McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS COLIN QUINN AND CQE, INC. (Local Rule 7.1-1) of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CQE, Inc., Colin Quinn, (McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles - West District, case number 19SMCV01837 Receipt No: 0973-24831903 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants CQE, Inc., Colin Quinn. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT, #2 SUMMONS) (Attorney Edwin F McPherson added to party CQE, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin F McPherson added to party Colin Quinn(pty:dft))(McPherson, Edwin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less