This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2021 at 07:14:02 (UTC).

Lawrence v. Greenwich Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Lawrence filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Greenwich Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rachel P. Kovner and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04663

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicolas S Lawrence

Petitioners and Defendants

Greenwich Insurance Company

Travelers Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Liff Henderson

Attorney at Gregory Spektor & Associates P.C.

One Cross Island Plaza, Ste. 203C

Rosedale, NY 11422

Defendant Attorney

Kevin Michael Zimmerman

Attorney at Lewis BrisBois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

77 Water Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Court Sheet

1 #6

Rule 7.1 Statement

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 11:30 A.M. on 12/03/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 12/03/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/21/2021 (Manson, Eddie) (Manson, Eddie) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Travelers Insurance Company, Greenwich Insurance Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 2 replaced die to corruption on 8/24/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Greenwich Insurance Company and Travelers Insurance Company from Supreme Court of New York Kings County, case number 711246/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14765214) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Court Sheet, #6 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELERS INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Michael Zimmerman