Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/28/2020 at 10:40:11 (UTC).

Lawhorn et al v. McLaughlin et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Lawhorn filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against McLaughlin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04011

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony Philippe

Galesburg, IL 61401

Greggory Lawhorn

Galesburg, IL 61401

Defendants

. Livingston

. Sheland

Rob Jeffreys

Roy Little

Christopher McLaughlin

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) AFFIDAVIT by Greggory Lawhorn. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Allow Correspondence by Plaintiff Anthony Philippe. Responses due by 4/8/2020 (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#19

(#19) AFFIDAVIT/Exhibit by Greggory Lawhorn. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

18 #3

Waiver Sheland

18 #2

Waiver McLaughlin

18 #1

Waiver Livingston

#18

(#18) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sheland, McLaughlin, Livingston, Roy Little on 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver Livingston, #2 Waiver McLaughlin, #3 Waiver Sheland)(KE, ilcd) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/12/2020) (KE, ilcd). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#17

(#17) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/12/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#13

(#16) MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/12/2020. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiffs state an Eighth Amendment claim for failure-to-protect from harm against Defendants McLaughlin, Little, Livingston, and Sheland. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate Rob Jeffreys as a defendant. The clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendants McLaughlin, Little, Livingston, and Sheland pursuant to the standard procedures. Plaintiffs have filed several affidavits with the Court describing recent events at Hill Correctional Center. See #9 #11 #13 . Plaintiffs are advised that discovery is generally not filed with the Court. If Plaintiffs want the Court to take any type of action, they must file a motion. Plaintiffs are reminded that they may proceed as co-plaintiffs in this matter, but that they may not act on the other's behalf. Each plaintiff must sign his own pleadings. Joint pleadings must be signed by both plaintiffs. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. See written order. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#8

(#8) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Greggory Lawhorn.(ED, ilcd) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#7

TEXT ORDER granting #7 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.45. The agency having custody of Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 2/6/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Remark: IFP form attached pursuant to Text Order 1/29/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 1/29/2020. Plaintiffs filed a joint Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Under the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, each litigant is required to pay a separate filing fee. Boriboune v. Page, 391 F.3d 852, 855-56 (7th Cir. 2004). Accordingly, Plaintiffs are directed to resubmit within 21 days of this Order separate petitions to proceed in forma pauperis that reflects their individual financial situations. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Clerk is directed to send blank IFP forms to the Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs are also advised that Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 requires each of them to sign any pleadings that are filed in this case. Plaintiffs may not act on each other's behalf.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Philippe, Greggory Lawhorn.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AFFIDAVIT by Greggory Lawhorn. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Allow Correspondence by Plaintiff Anthony Philippe. Responses due by 4/8/2020 (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AFFIDAVIT/Exhibit by Greggory Lawhorn. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sheland, McLaughlin, Livingston, Roy Little on 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver Livingston, #2 Waiver McLaughlin, #3 Waiver Sheland)(KE, ilcd) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/12/2020) (KE, ilcd). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/12/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MERIT REVIEW AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 3/12/2020. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiffs state an Eighth Amendment claim for failure-to-protect from harm against Defendants McLaughlin, Little, Livingston, and Sheland. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate Rob Jeffreys as a defendant. The clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendants McLaughlin, Little, Livingston, and Sheland pursuant to the standard procedures. Plaintiffs have filed several affidavits with the Court describing recent events at Hill Correctional Center. See #9 #11 #13 . Plaintiffs are advised that discovery is generally not filed with the Court. If Plaintiffs want the Court to take any type of action, they must file a motion. Plaintiffs are reminded that they may proceed as co-plaintiffs in this matter, but that they may not act on the other's behalf. Each plaintiff must sign his own pleadings. Joint pleadings must be signed by both plaintiffs. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. See written order. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Philippe - now located at Pontiac Corr Center. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVITS by Greggory Lawhorn. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE: The Clerk of the Court has been informed by IDOC that effective immediately, Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, has been transferred from Hill Correctional Center to Pontiac Correctional Center. The Illinois Department of Corrections has conveyed this information simply as a courtesy to the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, is reminded that he is under a continuing obligation to keep the Clerk and each opposing party informed of any change in his location. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Local Rule 16.3(K), every pro se plaintiff must notify the Clerk of this court in writing of any change of address during the entire pendency of his case. It is not the Court's responsibility to independently maintain current addresses on all parties to pending actions. As a courtesy to Plaintiff, however, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Notice to Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, at the institution where he has reportedly been transferred. Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, shall, no later than 14 days from the date of this Notice, file a notice of change of address with the Clerk. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action. Notice of Change of Address to be filed by plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, by 3/20/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held on 3/5/2020 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Merit Review Hearing not held. Appearance of one of the plaintiffs was unable to be obtained, the court will issue a written order. (not recorded) (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #7 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.45. The agency having custody of Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff, Anthony Philippe, is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 2/6/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Greggory Lawhorn.(ED, ilcd) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Anthony Philippe.(ED, ilcd) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Remark: IFP form attached pursuant to Text Order 1/29/2020 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 1/29/2020. Plaintiffs filed a joint Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Under the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, each litigant is required to pay a separate filing fee. Boriboune v. Page, 391 F.3d 852, 855-56 (7th Cir. 2004). Accordingly, Plaintiffs are directed to resubmit within 21 days of this Order separate petitions to proceed in forma pauperis that reflects their individual financial situations. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Clerk is directed to send blank IFP forms to the Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs are also advised that Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 requires each of them to sign any pleadings that are filed in this case. Plaintiffs may not act on each other's behalf.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Anthony Philippe (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Greggory Lawhorn (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Anthony Philippe, Greggory Lawhorn.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Philippe, Greggory Lawhorn.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE LIVINGSTON is a litigant