This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:07:25 (UTC).

Law v. Natera, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Law filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Natera, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01162

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Law

Defendant

Natera, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L. Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#14

(#8) ORDER RELATING CASE. Motions terminated: (12 in 4:22-cv-00985-JST) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Amanda Davis. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#17

(#11) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (15) Stipulation for Consolidation and Setting Deadlines in case 4:22-cv-00985-JST.Associated Cases: 4:22-cv-00985-JST, 4:22-cv-01162-JST(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Natera, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Law. Natera, Inc. served on 2/28/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/28/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 27, 2022 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ A>. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (15) Stipulation for Consolidation and Setting Deadlines in case 4:22-cv-00985-JST.Associated Cases: 4:22-cv-00985-JST, 4:22-cv-01162-JST(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2022) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 27, 2022 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ A>. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RELATING CASE. Motions terminated: (12 in 4:22-cv-00985-JST) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Amanda Davis. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/28/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Law. Natera, Inc. served on 2/28/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 3/7/2022) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Natera, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/11/2022. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Natera, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16935692.). Filed by Amanda Law. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/24/2022) Modified on 2/25/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Natera, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Timothy Fisher