This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2019 at 07:24:22 (UTC).

Lavigne v. Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Lavigne filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Rodriguez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01576

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Lavigne

Waterbury, CT 06705

Defendant

Derik Rodriguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Alma Rose Nunley

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

165 Capitol Avenue, Ste 5000

Hartford, CT 06106

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Exhibit A

9 #2

Exhibit B

#10

#11

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion requesting Defendant incur expenses or waive service of summons, because Defendant has entered an appearance and requested an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/5/2019. (Conde, Djenab) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Derik Rodriguez to 1/17/2020. Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2020. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time until January 17, 2020 for Defendant to file a response to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/4/2019. (Conde, Djenab) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 17, 2020 to respond to #1 Complaint by Derik Rodriguez. (Nunley, Alma) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Alma Rose Nunley on behalf of Derik Rodriguez (Nunley, Alma) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Request Defendant Incur Expenses for Waiver of Service by Bruce Lavigne.Responses due by 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Derik Rodriguez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bruce Lavigne* *25 Birchfield Drive* *Waterbury, CT 06705* (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Derik Rodriguez. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Pro Se Appearance filed by Bruce Lavigne, #3 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Bruce Lavigne, and #1 Complaint filed by Bruce Lavigne. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/8/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/8/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2019. Discovery due by 4/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketFiling fee received from Bruce Lavigne: $400.00, receipt number CTXH00016188. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent to Electronic Notice by Bruce Lavigne. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Pro Se Appearance by Bruce Lavigne. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Derik Rodriguez, filed by Bruce Lavigne.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alma Rose Nunley Esq.