This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 08:36:38 (UTC).

LAVELLE v. WILLIAMSON, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 LAVELLE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WILLIAMSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC T TREADWELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC T TREADWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAWEISI LAVELLE

Mcdonough, GA 30253

Defendants

ERIC PIPKIN

JERRY MEADOWS

WAYMON HENSON

BOSSIE DAVIS

MICHAEL SHANNON WILLIAMSON

MICHAEL BRAYTON

KATHERINE KNAPP

OFFICER TIMOTHY DAVIS

BARCLAY BANTA

ANTHONY THOMPSON

Jake Sutton

JEREMY HAIRE

TIMOTHY DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELLA A HUGHES

105 Jonesboro St

Mcdonough, GA 30253

PASSION V BRISCOE

1230 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant Attorneys

ROGER ALLAN CHALMERS

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334-9003

WADE WILKES HERRING, III

40 Capital Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

G KEVIN MORRIS

4330 S Lee St Ne Bldg 400 Ste A

Buford, GA 30518

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendant Eric Pipkin's Motion to Dismiss

#10

#9

8 #1

Memorandum in Support Brief In Support

#8

7 #1

Exhibit First Amended Complaint

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #3

Summons Michael Shannon Williamson

3 #2

Summons Eric Pipkin

3 #1

Summons Anthony Thompson

#3

2 #5

Summons Jerry Meadows

2 #4

Summons Wayman Henson

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet COVER SHEET FOR COMPLAINT

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ERIC PIPKIN filed by WADE WILKES HERRING, III. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Eric Pipkin's Motion to Dismiss)(HERRING, WADE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by CAWEISI LAVELLE (HUGHES, ELLA) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Amended Document filed by CAWEISI LAVELLE ); Document must be re-filed using correct event - Amended Complaint. (vs) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #1 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint : by BARCLAY BANTA, MICHAEL BRAYTON, BOSSIE DAVIS, TIMOTHY DAVIS, JEREMY HAIRE, WAYMON HENSON, KATHERINE KNAPP, JERRY MEADOWS, JAKE SUTTON, ANTHONY THOMPSON, MICHAEL SHANNON WILLIAMSON filed by G KEVIN MORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief In Support)(MORRIS, G) Modified on 6/23/2021 to edit docket text(vs). (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***Refiled at #9 *** NOTICE of First Amended Complaint for Damages by CAWEISI LAVELLE,amending #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(HUGHES, ELLA) Text modified on 6/22/2021 (kat). Modified on 6/23/2021 to add docket text(vs). (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CAWEISI LAVELLE. as toERIC PIPKIN (HUGHES, ELLA) Modified on 6/14/2021 to edit docket text (vs). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ROGER ALLAN CHALMERS on behalf of ERIC PIPKIN Attorney ROGER ALLAN CHALMERS added to party ERIC PIPKIN(pty:dft)(CHALMERS, ROGER) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CAWEISI LAVELLE. as to All Defendants (HUGHES, ELLA) Modified on 6/11/2021 to add docket text (vs). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ERIC PIPKIN, JAKE SUTTON, ANTHONY THOMPSON, MICHAEL SHANNON WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons Anthony Thompson, #2 Summons Eric Pipkin, #3 Summons Michael Shannon Williamson)(vs) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to BARCLAY BANTA, MICHAEL BRAYTON, BOSSIE DAVIS, TIMOTHY DAVIS, JEREMY HAIRE, WAYMON HENSON, JERRY MEADOWS, ERIC PIPKIN, JAKE SUTTON, ANTHONY THOMPSON, MICHAEL SHANNON WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bossie Davis, #2 Summons Michael Brayton, #3 Summons Jeremy Haire, #4 Summons Wayman Henson, #5 Summons Jerry Meadows, #6 Summons Eric Pipkin, #7 Summons Jake Sutton, #8 Summons Anthony Thompson, #9 Summons Timothy Davis, #10 Summons Michael Williamson)(vs) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint ); Other (enter description). In the future, all electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. NO NEED TO REFILE.(vs) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3796830, $402 filed by CAWEISI LAVELLE (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet COVER SHEET FOR COMPLAINT)(HUGHES, ELLA) Modified on 5/17/2021 to add docket text(vs). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/18/2021) (ans). (Entered: 05/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less