Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2021 at 10:03:03 (UTC).

LAVELL v. CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 LAVELL filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06832

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM T. LAVELL

Defendant

CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAM RIESER

Attorney at SIDNEY L. GOLD & ASSOCIATES PC

1835 Market Street, Suite 515

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SIDNEY L. GOLD

Attorney at SIDNEY L. GOLD & ASSOC., P.C.

185 Market Street, Ste 515

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM T. LAVELL. CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY L. GOLD on behalf of WILLIAM T. LAVELL (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12308121) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM T. LAVELL.(RIESER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM T. LAVELL. CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY L. GOLD on behalf of WILLIAM T. LAVELL (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketJudge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CAMDEN COUNTY COLLEGE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12308121) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM T. LAVELL.(RIESER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camden County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM RIESER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sidney L. Gold