This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 11:42:14 (UTC).

Lavalliere v. IMG Academy, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Lavalliere filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against IMG Academy, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas G. Wilson and Kathryn K. Mizelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judge

Kathryn K. Mizelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL LAVALLIERE

Defendant

IMG ACADEMY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason M. Melton

Attorney at Whittel & Melton, LLC

11020 Northcliffe Blvd

Spring Hill, FL 34608-3768

William Jonathan Sheslow

Attorney at Whittel & Melton, LLC

11020 Northcliffe Blvd

Spring Hill, FL 34608-3768

Defendant Attorney

Catherine H. Molloy

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900

Tampa, FL 33602-5148

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT A - COMPOSITE OF STATE PLEADINGS

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

#3

3 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT A - ARBITRATION AGREEMENT

#5

5 #1

Exhibit A - Arbritration Agreement

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case. The proceedings are STAYED and the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file. The parties shall file a joint status report on May 3, 2021, and every ninety(90) days thereafter advising the Court on the progress of arbitration. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/2/2021. (NPC) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Compel Abritration and Stay Case by IMG Academy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement)(Molloy, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified text on 2/1/2021 (BSN). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Response due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/26/2021. (NPC) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by IMG Academy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement)(Molloy, Catherine) Modified on 1/20/2021 to edit text (CRH). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-0075-T-210TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Manatee County, case number 2020-CA-4709 filed in State Court on 12/07/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17753309 filed by IMG Academy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Composite of State Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molloy, Catherine) Modified on 1/12/2021 (JLD). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMG ACADEMY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Michael Melton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Jonathan Sheslow