This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2021 at 10:22:16 (UTC).

Lavalle v. Neutrogena Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 Lavalle filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Neutrogena Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-62153

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Lavalle

Defendants

Neutrogena Corporation

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles E. Schaffer

Jason Sultzer

David C. Magagna, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

14 #1

*Restricted*

14 #14

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#13

#12

#11

10 #2

Cert of Good Standing

10 #1

Affidavit

9 #3

Text of Proposed Order

9 #2

Cert of Good Standing

9 #1

Affidavit

9 #9

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/25/2021. (eca) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#16) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 7:21-cv-06091-VB with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 0:21-cv-62153 Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 0:21-md-3015-AHS. (pes) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#15) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (pes) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 7:21-cv-06091. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes). (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/8/2021) (sjo) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Charles E. Schaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/5/2021) (mml) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for David C. Magagna to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/5/2021) (mml) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for David C. Magagna to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24888326. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED ORDER: Accordingly, by July 23, 2021, plaintiff shall submit a letter explaining in detail why the case is properly designated for assignment to the White Plains courthouse under Rule 18 or acknowledging that it should be reassigned to the Manhattan courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/19/2021) (mml) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Accordingly, by July 23, 2021, plaintiff's counsel shall submit a letter explaining in detail why the case is properly designated for assignment to White Plains under Rule 18, or acknowledging that it should be reassigned to the Manhattan courthouse. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/16/2021) (mml) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neutrogena Corporation and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Lavalle..(Sultzer, Jason) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jason P. Sultzer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): plaintiff party text error in summons caption, must correspond exactly to pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sultzer, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neutrogena Corporation and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Steven Lavalle..(Sultzer, Jason) Modified on 7/16/2021 (vf). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Neutrogena Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24800008)Document filed by Steven Lavalle..(Sultzer, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less