This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 11:46:17 (UTC).

LAUX et al v. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 LAUX filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01271

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Regina Laux

Jeffrey Laux

Defendants

AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN SELECT INS. CO.

WESTFIELD INS. COMPANY

WESTFIELD NATIONAL INS. CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Ray Thompson

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT D. KING, JR., P.C.

22 E. Washington Street, Suite 310

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Robert D. King, Jr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT D. KING, JR, P.C.

22 E. Washington Street, Suite 310

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly E. Howard

Attorney at SMITH FISHER MAAS HOWARD & LLOYD, P.C.

7209 North Shadeland Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46250

Rebecca Jean Maas

Attorney at SMITH FISHER MAAS HOWARD & LLOYD, P.C.

7209 North Shadeland Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46250

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

State Court Record Appearance for Plaintiffs, Jury Demand by Plaintiff, Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/7/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2020. Discovery due by 1/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/6/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on May 20, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on August 20, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. (Eastern Time), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs JEFFREY LAUX, REGINA LAUX and Defendants. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Jurisdictional Statement Responding to Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (King, Robert) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER - Defendants removed this action to this Court on March 28, 2019, alleging that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case. Dkt. #1 . Local Rule 81-1(b) provides: Within 30 days after the filing of the notice of removal, every plaintiff who has not filed a motion to remand must file a statement responding to the notice of removal's allegations as to the citizenship of the parties and the amount in controversy. If the plaintiff lacks sufficient information upon which to form a belief about those allegations despite meeting and conferring in good faith with the removing party about them, the plaintiff may so state. More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiffs have not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by June 10, 2019. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/9/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by All Defendants.(Howard, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/1/2019.(SWM) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly E. Howard on behalf of Defendants AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Howard, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent OHIO FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY for AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Maas, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent OHIO FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY for WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Maas, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent OHIO FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY for WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Maas, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Jean Maas on behalf of Defendants AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Maas, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior 2, case number 49D02-1902-CT-008286, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5358355) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Appearance for Plaintiffs, Jury Demand by Plaintiff, Summons to Westfield Ins. Co., Summons to Westfield Natl. Ins. Co. Complaint for Damages, Notice of Completion of Service, Appearance for Westfield Ins. Co. and Westfield Natl. Ins. Co., Jury Demand by Defendants, Automatic Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond, Amended Complaint for Damages, Amended Appearance, Summons for American Select Ins., and Appearance for American Select Ins.)(Maas, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly E Howard