This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:27:34 (UTC).

Laury v. Juul Labs Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Laury filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylor Laury

Defendants

JUUL Labs Inc

Pax Labs Inc

Altria Group Inc.

Philip Morris USA Inc

Juul Labs Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank H. Kerney, III

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan

201 N. Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Emily Jeffcott

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

700 South Palafox Street, Suite 95

Pensacola, FL 32502

Emily Catherine Jeffcott

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

700 S Palafox Street, Suite 95

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. Pax Labs Inc served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Catherine Jeffcott (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. Altria Group Inc. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. Philip Morris USA Inc served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2913 In Re: Juul Labs Inc Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation.. Signed by John W. Nichols Clerk of the Panel. (jak) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00853. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

3 #1

*Restricted*

#6

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Taylor Laury. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075028.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. JUUL Labs Inc served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2020, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (376 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (375 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (371 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (374 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order, (373 in 3:19-md-02913-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. Philip Morris USA Inc served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. JUUL Labs Inc served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. Pax Labs Inc served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Laury. Altria Group Inc. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Catherine Jeffcott (Jeffcott, Emily) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Eastern District of Arkansas, 19-00853, Laury v. Juul Labs Inc, Opened in California Northern District as 20-00128 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 16 cc: JPMDL. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00853. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2913 In Re: Juul Labs Inc Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation.. Signed by John W. Nichols Clerk of the Panel. (jak) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Juul Labs Inc, Philip Morris USA Inc. and returned to attorney for plaintiff. (jap) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Taylor Laury. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075028.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.