This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2021 at 11:04:25 (UTC).

Laufer v. Rudra Sai LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Laufer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Rudra Sai LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Laufer

Defendant

Rudra Sai LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tristan Wade Gillespie

Attorney at Tristan W. Gillespie, Esq.

5150 Cottage Farm Road

Johns Creek, GA 30022

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees except as otherwise agreed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/09/2021. (jlh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Default Judgment. Defendant is ordered to bring its third-party booking sites into compliance and to comply with all the provisions within four months from the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff is ordered to submit its application for attorney's fees and costs within fourteen days; thereafter, judgment will be entered in favor of Plaintiff. Rudra Sai, LLC is terminated as a defendant in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/26/2021. (jlh) Modified on 1/26/2021 (jlh). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Laufer (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Deborah Laufer. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 2/3/2021 (jlh). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Rudra Sai LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 01/21/2021. (jlh) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Entry of Default by Deborah Laufer. Responses due by 2/3/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Laufer. Rudra Sai LLC served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/18/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

3 #1

Corrected Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Rudra Sai LLC. (pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

2 #1

Forms

#2

(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rudra Sai LLC, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees except as otherwise agreed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/09/2021. (jlh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Laufer (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Deborah Laufer. (Gillespie, Tristan) Modified on 2/3/2021 (jlh). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Attorney Fees by Deborah Laufer. Responses due by 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit Process server invoice, #3 Exhibit Gillespie resume, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Expert's resume, #6 Exhibit Expert's invoice, #7 Exhibit Gillespie timesheet)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Default Judgment. Defendant is ordered to bring its third-party booking sites into compliance and to comply with all the provisions within four months from the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff is ordered to submit its application for attorney's fees and costs within fourteen days; thereafter, judgment will be entered in favor of Plaintiff. Rudra Sai, LLC is terminated as a defendant in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/26/2021. (jlh) Modified on 1/26/2021 (jlh). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Deborah Laufer. Responses due by 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Rudra Sai LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 01/21/2021. (jlh) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Entry of Default by Deborah Laufer. Responses due by 2/3/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Laufer. Rudra Sai LLC served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/18/2021. (Gillespie, Tristan) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Rudra Sai LLC. (pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2020: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number AGASDC-2987605. (pts) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rudra Sai LLC, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tristan Wade Gillespie