This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2020 at 08:54:18 (UTC).

Laufer v. North Aurora Hotel, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Laufer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against North Aurora Hotel, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03519

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Laufer

Defendants

North Aurora Hotel, LLC

North Aurora Hotel, LLC doing business as Rodeway Inn North Aurora

North Aurora Hotel, LLC a Illinois Limited Liability Company doing business as Rodeway Inn North Aurora

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kimberly Ann Corkill

Attorney at Corkill Law Firm, P.l.l.c.

7 N Coyle St

Pensacola, FL 32502

Robert Edward Lewin

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert E. Lewin

5225 Old Orchard Road, Suite 50

Skokie, IL 60077

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 7/31/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Robert Edward Lewin (las, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Kimberly Ann Corkill (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deborah Laufer; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17115616.(Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 7/31/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Robert Edward Lewin (las, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant North Aurora Hotel, LLC. (ng, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Kimberly Ann Corkill (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deborah Laufer; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17115616.(Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less