This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:36:03 (UTC).

Laufer v. Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Laufer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Mirbeau of Skaneateles L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01574

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Laufer

Defendants

Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC

Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Sverd

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Sverd, PLLC

225 Broadway, Suite 613

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Robert J. Thorpe

Attorney at Barclay Damon LLP - Syracuse Office

125 East Jefferson Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION (extending time to respond to the complaint until February 26, 2020) by Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC, Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. submitted to Judge Lovric. (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Thorpe on behalf of Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC, Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mirbeau of Hospitality Services LLC on 01/06/2020, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mirbeau of Skaneateles, LP on 01/06/2020, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

2 #1

Summons for Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC

#2

(#2) Summonses Issued as to Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC and Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC)(see) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC and Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4977717) filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: Motion #7 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 2/26/2020. The Court advises the parties that all other schedules, deadlines and the rule 16 In Person conference scheduled for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM will remain as scheduled, and the parties are directed to review Dkt. No. 3, G.O. 25 Document. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/31/2020. (jdp ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION (extending time to respond to the complaint until February 26, 2020) by Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC, Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. submitted to Judge Lovric. (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Thorpe on behalf of Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC, Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC answer due 1/27/2020; Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. answer due 1/27/2020. (see) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mirbeau of Hospitality Services LLC on 01/06/2020, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mirbeau of Skaneateles, LP on 01/06/2020, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Sverd, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses Issued as to Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC and Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC)(see) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mirbeau Hospitality Services, LLC and Mirbeau of Skaneateles L.P. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4977717) filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Erik Sverd