This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 08:23:09 (UTC).

Laufer v. Joliet Lodging, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Laufer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Joliet Lodging, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00121

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Laufer

Defendant

Joliet Lodging, Inc. an Illinois Corporation doing business as Motel 6

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kimberly Ann Corkill

Attorney at Corkill Law Firm, P.l.l.c.

7 N Coyle St

Pensacola, FL 32502

Robert Edward Lewin

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert E. Lewin

5225 Old Orchard Road, Suite 50

Skokie, IL 60077

Defendant Attorney

Kevin Andrew Fritz

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the notice of dismissal, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Laufer (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendant is to respond to the Complaint by 3/3/2021. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Joliet Lodging, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Joliet Lodging, Inc. by Kevin Andrew Fritz (Fritz, Kevin) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Robert Edward Lewin (bg, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Laufer as to Joliet Lodging, Inc. on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 3/19/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Joliet Lodging, Inc. (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Kimberly Ann Corkill (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deborah Laufer; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17810434.(Corkill, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin A. Fritz