This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 07:40:05 (UTC).

Laufer et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Laufer was filed as a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04378

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ms Deborah Laufer

Defendant

Shah Hospitality, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amale Knox

330 Harrison St.

Pontiac, MI 48341

Robert Edward Lewin

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert E. Lewin

5225 Old Orchard Road, Suite 50

Skokie, IL 60077

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Laufer (Knox, Amale) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#5

(#5) SETTLEMENT Agreement (Knox, Amale) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Robert Edward Lewin. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Knox, Amale) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deborah Laufer; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17252989.(Knox, Amale) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Laufer (Knox, Amale) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SETTLEMENT Agreement (Knox, Amale) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Robert Edward Lewin. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Knox, Amale) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Shah Hospitality, L.L.C. (dxb, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deborah Laufer; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17252989.(Knox, Amale) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less