This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2020 at 11:13:30 (UTC).

Lauer v. Security Finance of Missouri, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/03/2020 Lauer filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine D. Perry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine D. Perry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amie Lauer

Mexico, MO 65265

Defendant

Security Finance of Missouri, LLC

120 S. Central Ave.

Clayton, MO 63105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael S. Holder

Attorney at HOLDER AND SUSAN

107 N. Seventh St., Suite 200

Columbia, MO 65201

Chris Miller

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRIS MILLER

1902 Corona Rd., Suite 200

Columbia, MO 65203

Defendant Attorneys

Eric A. Todd

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS - St Louis

7700 Bonhomme Avenue, Suite 650

St. Louis, MO 63105

Mallory Stumpf Zoia

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS - St Louis

7700 Bonhomme Avenue, Suite 650

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Amie Lauer. (Miller, Chris) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Chris Miller / The Law Office of Chris Miller ;substituted for:Michael S. Holder / Holder Susan Slusher LLC by Plaintiff Amie Lauer. (Holder, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC.. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Mallory Stumpf Zoia for Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Zoia, Mallory) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Eric A. Todd for Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Amie Lauer Process Server: Process Server St. Louis (Holder, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Original Filing Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-7999936, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Amie Lauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Summons)(Holder, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Amie Lauer. (Miller, Chris) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Chris Miller / The Law Office of Chris Miller ;substituted for:Michael S. Holder / Holder Susan Slusher LLC by Plaintiff Amie Lauer: ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/19/20. (CDP) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Chris Miller / The Law Office of Chris Miller ;substituted for:Michael S. Holder / Holder Susan Slusher LLC by Plaintiff Amie Lauer. (Holder, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC.. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Mallory Stumpf Zoia for Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Zoia, Mallory) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Eric A. Todd for Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. (Todd, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Security Finance of Missouri, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/17/2020.) (TMT) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Michael S. Holder. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Amie Lauer Process Server: Process Server St. Louis (Holder, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-7999936, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Amie Lauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Summons)(Holder, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Holder