This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:25:42 (UTC).

LATIN CONCEPTS LLC et al v. SALIM

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LATIN CONCEPTS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SALIM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard J. Leon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03651

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard J. Leon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

MATE LLC

1624 U Street Nw, Unit 101

Washington, DC 20009

CHI-CHA, LLC

1624 U Street, Nw, Unit 101

Washington, DC 20009

LATIN CONCEPTS LLC

1624 U Street, Unit 101

Washington, DC 20009

Defendant

SYED FAREES SALIM

Falls Church, VA 22043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William David Day

Attorney at WILLIAM DAY LAW GROUP, LLC

4701 Sangamore Road, Suite 100N

Bethesda, MD 20816

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/3/2020. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SYED FAREES SALIM. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #2

Summons Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6627152) filed by LATIN CONCEPTS LLC, MATE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Day, William) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/3/2020. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SYED FAREES SALIM. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6627152) filed by LATIN CONCEPTS LLC, MATE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Day, William) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less