This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2021 at 07:59:54 (UTC).

Latimer v. U-Haul

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 Latimer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U-Haul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn K. Mizelle, Amanda Arnold Sansone and Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01892

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

Presiding Judges

Kathryn K. Mizelle

Kathryn Kimball Mizelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin G. Latimer

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendants

UHaul

U-Haul

 

Court Documents

#7

#8

#6

5 #3

Mailing Envelope

5 #2

Mailing Envelope

5 #1

Affidavit

#5

4 #3

Mailing Envelope

4 #2

Mailing Envelope

4 #1

Copy of Order

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Mailing Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JUDGMENT in favor of U-Haul against Calvin G. Latimer. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/6/2021. (JLD) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER adopting #6 Report and Recommendation on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied and the case is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in U-Haul's favor, terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and close this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/5/2021. (SMR) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency filed by Calvin Latimer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/13/2021. (SFC) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Calvin G. Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Mailing Envelope, #3 Mailing Envelope)(AG) Modified to add pdf image on 8/23/2021 (AG). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial by Calvin G. Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Order, #2 Mailing Envelope, #3 Mailing Envelope)(ABC) Modified text on 8/23/2021 (AG). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER taking under advisement #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Mr Latimer must submit an amended complaint and amended affidavit by September 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/11/2021. (MLM) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Calvin G. Latimer. (CRH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UHaul filed by Calvin G. Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(CRH) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant

Latest cases where U-Haul Co of Colorado is a litigant