This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2020 at 08:21:19 (UTC).

Latimer v. Newby et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Latimer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Newby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05080

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charity Latimer

Defendants

Reliable Holdings, Inc.

John and Jane Doe #1-3

Reliable Carriers, Inc.

William Newby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas James Lyman

Attorney at The Lyman Firm

Suite 275, 2860 Piedmont Rd.

Atlanta, GA 30305

Jennifer Gore-Cuthbert

Attorney at Atlanta Personal Injury Law Group

Suite 246, 5755 North Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Miguel L. Rodriguez

Attorney at Atlanta Personal Injury Law Group

Suite 246, 5755 North Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Defendant Attorneys

John D. Dixon

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

Brent Michael Estes

Attorney at Dennis Corry Smith & Dixon, LLP- ATL

Suite 1400, 900 Circle 75 Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Jury Demand

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit -5 -Demand Letter

1 #4

Exhibit -4 -Demand Letter

1 #3

Exhibit -3 -State Court Jury Demand

1 #2

Exhibit -2 -State Court Answer

1 #1

Exhibit -1 -Complaint

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Initial Disclosures by William Newby, Reliable Carriers, Inc., Reliable Holdings, Inc..(Estes, Brent) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial Disclosures by Charity Latimer.(Lyman, Thomas) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by William Newby, Reliable Carriers, Inc., Reliable Holdings, Inc.. (Estes, Brent) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order, (Estes, Brent) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Standing Order (Lyman, Thomas) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas James Lyman on behalf of Charity Latimer (Lyman, Thomas) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/18/19. (bnp) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by William Newby, Reliable Carriers, Inc. and Reliable Holdings, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/6/2020. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Reliable Holdings, Inc., William Newby and Reliable Carriers, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9069239) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -2 -State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit -3 -State Court Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit -4 -Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit -5 -Demand Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELIABLE CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Dixon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent Michael Estes