This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2022 at 16:14:19 (UTC).

Latham et al v. The 1953 Trust et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Latham filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The 1953 Trust. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louis L. Stanton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07102

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis L. Stanton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Doe (1-10)

Tracey Y. Latham

Jane Doe (1-5)

David G. Latham

Defendants

Miramax, llc.

Sir Philip Green

David Boise

Virgil Abloh

Tutor-Saliba Corporation

Universal Music Group

Jean Luc Brunel

Shelley Massenburg-Smith

Quatar Investment Authority

Marcello Claure

Kanye O. West

Darren Indyke

John Does (1-100)

The Weinstein Corporation

Sprint Corporation

Richard Kahn

25 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Appeal Package

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceived returned mail re: #5 Letter. Mail was addressed to Charlene Y. Latham, 4900 Airport Parkway, Addison, TX 75001 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return To Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable To Forward. (vn) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketForm Request Mailed: Request for Appeals Package from Charlene Y. Latham 4900 Airport Parkway, Addison, TX 75001 mailed on 12/03/2020. (ta) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #5 Letter, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER from Charlene Latham dated 12/2/20 re: REQUEST FOR APPEALS PACKET - CASE 20-CV-7102. Document filed by Charlene Y. Latham.(sc) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceived returned mail re: #3 Order of Dismissal, #4 Judgment. Mail was addressed to Charlene Y. Latham, 4900 Airport Parkway, Addison, TX 75001 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return To Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable To Forward. (vn) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #3 Order of Dismissal, #4 Judgment, and Notice of Appeal Instructions to Charlene Y. Latham at 4900 Airport Parkway, Addison, TX 75001. (kh) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Package) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Charlene Y. Latham and note service on the docket. The complaint is dismissed as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/18/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Virgil Abloh, Black Cube ltd., David Boise, Milton Brown, Jean Luc Brunel, Dwayne Carter, Shawn Carter, Marcello Claure, Corporation Does (1-100), Def Jam Recordings, Jane Does (1-100), John Does (1-100), G.O.O.D. Music, Philip Green, Darren Indyke, Richard Kahn, Robert Kelly, Beyonce G. Knowles, Shelley Massenburg-Smith, Ghislaine Maxwell, Miramax, llc., New York City Police Department, Parkwood Entertainment, Quatar Investment Authority, Rocnation, llc., Sony Entertainment, Sprint Corporation, The 1953 Trust, The City of New York, The Walt Disney Company, The Weinstein Corporation, Terrence Thornton, Tutor-Saliba Corporation, Universal Music Group, ViacomCBS, Vivendi SA, Harvey Weinstein, Kanye O. West, Young Money Entertainment. Document filed by David G. Latham, Charlene Y. Latham, Tracey Y. Latham, John Doe (1-10), Jane Doe (1-5). (sac) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/1/2020) (sac). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Charlene Y. Latham. (sac) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miramax, llc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Weinstein Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Tutor-Saliba Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant