This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2021 at 11:06:24 (UTC).

Last Chance Funding, Inc. v. Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Last Chance Funding, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tom Agler Livestock, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01090

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Last Chance Funding, Inc.

Defendants

Agler Livestock Trucking LLC

Tom Agler Livestock, LLC

Sharon Agler

Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC

Tom Agler Sr.

Rocking A Cattle LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas J. Kopcho

Attorney at Brouse McDowell - Cleveland

600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant Attorneys

Adam J. Motycka

Attorney at Diller & Rice - Toledo

1107 Adams Street

Toledo, OH 43606

Eric R. Neuman

Attorney at Diller & Rice - Toledo

1107 Adams Street

Toledo, OH 43606

 

Court Documents

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (M,L) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Prejudgment Attachment Without A Hearing Under R.C. 2715.03 and 2715.045 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #3 . (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#3

(#4) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Prejudgment Attachment Without A Hearing Under R.C. 2715.03 and 2715.045 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #3 . (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore no summons issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#19

(#19) ORDER. Phone Status held on 9/24/21. Defendants' Motion to Withdraw (Doc. #18 ) is found well-taken and granted. Defense counsel shall confirm withdrawal with his clients in writing, advising them that substitute counsel must enter an appearance by 11/1/21. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/21 is vacated to be rescheduled. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/27/21. (S,Na) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#18

(#18) Motion by Adam J. Motycka and Eric R. Neuman to withdraw as attorney filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#17

(#17) Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#16

(#16) Initial Disclosures of Plaintiff Last Chance Funding filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#15

(#15) Joint Motion to continue Case Management Scheduling Conference filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. Related document(s) #12 . (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#14

(#14) Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#13

(#13) Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice. CMC to be held on Monday, August 23, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Room 203, Ashley Courthouse, 1716 Spielbusch Avenue, Toledo, Ohio. Counsel and parties shall attend in person. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/20/2021. (D,L) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER. Phone Status held on 7/19/202121. This Court discussed with counsel the background of this case. Counsel shall complete Rule 26(a) initial disclosures. An in-person (counsel and clients) Case Management Conference (CMC) is set for Monday, August 23, 2021 at 11:00 AM (EDT). A CMC Notice will be filed simultaneously with this Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/20/2021. (D,L) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER. Phone Status held on 9/24/21. Defendants' Motion to Withdraw (Doc. #18 ) is found well-taken and granted. Defense counsel shall confirm withdrawal with his clients in writing, advising them that substitute counsel must enter an appearance by 11/1/21. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/21 is vacated to be rescheduled. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/27/21. (S,Na) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [non-document] of Phone Status re Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. #18 ) set for 9/24/21 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. (S,Na) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Motion by Adam J. Motycka and Eric R. Neuman to withdraw as attorney filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Initial Disclosures of Plaintiff Last Chance Funding filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER [non-document]. Joint Motion to Continue Case Management Conference (CMC) (Doc. #15 ) granted. 8/23/21 CMC vacated and reset for 10/4/21 at 3:00 PM at Chambers 203 before Judge Jack Zouhary. Counsel and parties shall attend in person. Judge Jack Zouhary on 8/18/21. (S,Na) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint Motion to continue Case Management Scheduling Conference filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. Related document(s) #12 . (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (Motycka, Adam) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice. CMC to be held on Monday, August 23, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Room 203, Ashley Courthouse, 1716 Spielbusch Avenue, Toledo, Ohio. Counsel and parties shall attend in person. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/20/2021. (D,L) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. Phone Status held on 7/19/202121. This Court discussed with counsel the background of this case. Counsel shall complete Rule 26(a) initial disclosures. An in-person (counsel and clients) Case Management Conference (CMC) is set for Monday, August 23, 2021 at 11:00 AM (EDT). A CMC Notice will be filed simultaneously with this Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/20/2021. (D,L) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Agler Livestock Trucking LLC, Rocking A Cattle LLC, Sharon Agler, Tom Agler Livestock, LLC, Tom Agler Sr., Tom Agler Sr. Livestock, LLC. (M,L) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Prejudgment Attachment Without A Hearing Under R.C. 2715.03 and 2715.045 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #3 . (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Prejudgment Attachment Without A Hearing Under R.C. 2715.03 and 2715.045 filed by Plaintiff Last Chance Funding, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Last Chance Funding, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Ja) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore no summons issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (L,Ja) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (L,Ja) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for Breach of Contract, Conversion and Intent to Defraud Under the Uniform Fraudulent Transfer Act R.C. 1336.04 against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402.00 Receipt number AOHNDC-10856130. Filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Pleading Motion for Prejudgment, #3 Affidavit) (Kopcho, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAST CHANCE FUNDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas J. Kopcho