This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 07:41:29 (UTC).

Last Chance Funding, Inc. v. Aryeh et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Last Chance Funding, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Aryeh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09165

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Last Chance Funding, Inc.

Defendants

Benjamin Aryeh

New Chance Capital, LLC

John Does 1-5 individually

John Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristin Gabrielle Garris

Attorney at Scarinci & Hollenbeck

3 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

William Robert Samuels

Attorney at SCARINCI HOLLENBECK, LLC

3 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Robert Samuels on behalf of Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Samuels, William) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garris, Kristin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Kristin Gabrielle Garris to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/6/2019) (cf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for January 13, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. by separate Order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/16/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/6/2019) (mro) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COMPLAINT against Benjamin Aryeh, John Does 1-5, John Does 1-5 individually, New Chance Capital, LLC. Document filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Garris, Kristin) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents John Does 1-5 individually, John Does 1-5 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Garris, Kristin) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Chance Capital, LLC. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Aryeh. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kristin Gabrielle Garris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1125; the County code has been modified to Nassau; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kristin Gabrielle Garris to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties John Does 1-5 with party text 'individually' and John Does 1-5 with party text 'as owner, officer, director, shareholder, founder, manager, agent, servant, employee, representative, and/or independent contractor of New Chance Capital, LLC'; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Aryeh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Garris, Kristin) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New Chance Capital, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Garris, Kristin) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc..(Garris, Kristin) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garris, Kristin) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Benjamin Aryeh, New Chance Capital, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17712211)Document filed by Last Chance Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Garris, Kristin) Modified on 10/4/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAST CHANCE FUNDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Gabrielle Garris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Robert Samuels