This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2021 at 21:03:29 (UTC).

Last Beach Cleanup v. Terracycle, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Last Beach Cleanup filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Terracycle, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna M. Ryu and Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-06086

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Donna M. Ryu

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Last Beach Cleanup

Defendants

Terracycle, Inc.

CSC Brands LP

Gerber Products Company

Late July Snacks LLC

L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc.

Materne North America

Coca-Cola Company

Clorox Company

Procter & Gamble Company

Tom's of Maine, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard Judd Hirsch

Attorney at Lexington Law Group

503 Divisadero Street

San Francisco, CA 941117

Defendant Attorney

Bryan Alexander Merryman

Attorney at White & Case LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2433

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hirsch, Howard) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Last Beach Cleanup re #11 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Hirsch, Howard) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Last Beach Cleanup.. (Hirsch, Howard) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gerber Products Company.. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Gerber Products Company, CSC Brands LP, Clorox Company, Coca-Cola Company, Last Beach Cleanup, Mateme North America, Procter & Gamble Company, Tom's of Maine, INc. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/20/2021) Modified on 8/23/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gerber Products Company identifying Corporate Parent Nestle S.A., Corporate Parent Nestle Holdings, Inc. for Gerber Products Company. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Gerber Products Company (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG21090702. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16260251). Filed byGerber Products Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Record), #2 Exhibit B (Notice of Filing of NOR), #3 Declaration of B. Merryman ISO Removal, #4 Exhibit C (Clorox 8-K), #5 Exhibit D (Clorox 10-K), #6 Exhibit E (Burt's Bees Product Label), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOM'S OF MAINE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Gerber Products Company is a litigant