This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 10:53:55 (UTC).

L'ASSOCIATION DES AMERICAINS ACCIDENTELS, et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 L'ASSOCIATION DES AMERICAINS ACCIDENTELS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03573

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEPHANIE MOSES

ALI KHANCHOUL

JULIE HOCQUET

RONALD WALTHER

ROBERTO COSTANTINO ETTO SILVIS

ARANGAGU STAACK DELGADO

MIRIAM THERESE KUPPER

LASSOCIATION DES AMRICAINS ACCIDENTELS

KIM MARGARET HALL

EPIFANIO ANTONIO MIGLIOZZI

KEVIN PURNELLE

STEPHEN SERRA

ROBYN SMOOR

JUSTIN SIM

STEVEN VAN LAEKEN

DEBORAH JANE MARNER

SARA CHOUCHANE

ALINE COSCARAT

Defendants

MIKE POMPEO

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence Marc Zell

Attorney at ZELL, ARON & CO.

Noam Binyamin Schreiber

Attorney at Israel

Defendant Attorney

Laurel H. Lum

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street, Ste 11008

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Declaration

#3

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2021. (tb) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' obligation to respond to the Complaint is hereby STAYED pending further order of the court and review of the parties' joint status report due on 3/5/21. Upon filing that report, to the extent the parties anticipate that the Defendant will file an answer, the parties may propose a due date for the answer or other response in that joint report. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order as appropriate. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/3/21. (DJS) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by MIKE POMPEO, CARL C. RISCH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lum, Laurel) Modified event on 2/3/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2021. (tb) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: In light of recent Executive and Administrative actions, the parties shall meet, confer and file a joint status report by 3/5/21 advising the court: 1) whether the current dispute has been mooted or the parties anticipate that it will be mooted; 2) whether the parties wish to stay this action for any reason, including the parties' negotiations over resolving this dispute; or 3) whether the parties agree that this litigation should continue as anticipated pursuant to the federal rules, local rules or a scheduling order. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order as appropriate. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/2/21. (DJS) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MIKE POMPEO served on 12/11/2020; CARL C. RISCH served on 12/11/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Zell, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of All Defendants (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Noam Binyamin Schreiber on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schreiber, Noam) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Noam Schreiber is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/11/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Noam Schreiber, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by L. Marc Zell (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zell, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MIKE POMPEO, CARL C. RISCH, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by STEPHEN SERRA, ARANGAGU STAACK DELGADO, ALINE COSCARAT, SARA CHOUCHANE, KIM MARGARET HALL, RONALD WALTHER, STEPHANIE MOSES, ALI KHANCHOUL, DEBORAH JANE MARNER, MIRIAM THERESE KUPPER, EPIFANIO ANTONIO MIGLIOZZI, KEVIN PURNELLE, STEVEN VAN LAEKEN, TIM ODONNELL, ROBERTO COSTANTINO ETTO SILVIS, PAULA CALVO SUAREZ, L'ASSOCIATION DES AMERICAINS ACCIDENTELS, JULIE HOCQUET, ROBYN SMOOR, JUSTIN SIM, FABIEN LEHAGRE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Zell, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurel H. Lum