This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2021 at 10:17:46 (UTC).

LASSETER v. SAUL

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 LASSETER filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SAUL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Tanya Walton Pratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLIN P. LASSETER

COLIN PATRICK LASSETER

Defendant

ANDREW M. SAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adriana Maria de la Torre

Attorney at THE DE LA TORRE LAW OFFICE LLC

333 N. Alabama Street, Suite 350

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

600 West Madison Street, 6Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60661-2474

Julian Clifford Wierenga

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is granted an enlargement of time, until June 7, 2021, to file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/31/2021. (TMC) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, (Filing No. 2), is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/8/2021 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is granted an enlargement of time, until June 7, 2021, to file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/31/2021. (TMC) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to June 7, 2021 to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed), filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brechtelsbauer, Erin) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Brechtelsbauer, Erin) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, (Filing No. 2), is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/8/2021 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Maria de la Torre on behalf of Plaintiff COLIN P. LASSETER. (de la Torre, Adriana) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff COLIN P. LASSETER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(de la Torre, Adriana) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by COLIN P. LASSETER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(de la Torre, Adriana) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Leigh Brechtelsbauer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Clifford Wierenga