This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2019 at 07:59:20 (UTC).

Lassair et al v. New Orleans City et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Lassair filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against New Orleans City. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Jane Triche Milazzo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11377

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Lassair

Telejacks & Things, Inc.

Patricia Lassair

Defendants

ARS Aleut Remediation LLC

City of New Orleans

New Orleans City

Weston Solutions, Inc.

ARS International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Joseph Rando

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven J. Rando, LLC

3530 Canal St.

New Orleans, LA 70119

Suzette Peychaud Bagneris

Attorney at Bagneris Firm, LLC

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Madro Bandaries

Attorney at Madro Bandaries, PLC

P.O. Box 56458

New Orleans, LA 70156

Emile Anthony Bagneris, III

Attorney at The Bagneris Firm

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas A. Casey, Jr.

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Ryan Estes Johnson

Attorney at Jones Walker (Baton Rouge)

Four United Plaza, 8555 United Plaza Blvd., 5Th Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Robert E. Dille

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2411

New Orleans, LA 70170

Rebecca Abbott Zotti

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2411

New Orleans, LA 70170

Stanley A. Millan

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Michael J. Laughlin

Attorney at City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

1300 Perdido Street, Suite 7E05

New Orleans, LA 70112

Churita H. Hansell

Attorney at City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

1300 Perdido Street, Suite 7E05

New Orleans, LA 70112

Sunni Jones LeBeouf

Attorney at City of New Orleans Law Deptment

1300 Perdido Street, Room 5E03

New Orleans, LA 70112

Donesia Diane Turner

Attorney at City of New Orleans Law Deptment

1300 Perdido Street, Room 5E03

New Orleans, LA 70112

Corwin St. Raymond

Attorney at City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

1300 Perdido Street, Suite 7E05

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

23 #1

Proposed Order Order

#23

15 #2

Exhibit Original Petition for Damages

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER: GRANTING #27 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines and continue the oral agrument date on the defendant city of New Orleans' Rule 12(b)(6) Dismissal Motion. IT IS ORDERED that the briefing deadline relative to the City of New Orleans' Rule 12 (b) (6) Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended from August 28, 2019 to October 9, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties appear before the Court on the 24th day of October, 2019, at 09:30 A.M. for participation in Oral argument on any and all Rule 12 (b) (6) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/19/2019.(am) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Summons Issued as to Weston Solutions, Inc. (am) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines and continue the oral agrument date on the defendant city of New Orleans' Rule 12(b)(6) Dismissal Motion by Eric Lassair, Patricia Lassair, Telejacks & Things, Inc. (Bagneris, Emile) Modified text on 8/16/2019 (am). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Request of Summons Issued as to Weston Solutions, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re #15 Amended Complaint. (Bagneris, Emile) (Main Document 26 replaced on 8/16/2019) (am). Modified text on 8/16/2019 (am). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 Amended Complaint as to ARS Aleut Remediation LLC answer due 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/9/19. (ecm) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.**2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.**3. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer as to #15 Amended Complaint by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Zotti, Rebecca) Modified text/removed referral and submission date on 8/9/2019 (am). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Certify Class by Eric Lassair, Patricia Lassair, Telejacks & Things, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bagneris, Emile) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (am). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER: GRANTING #17 Request for Oral Argument. IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on Defendant's #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is set for September 12, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to 7 minutes of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. 16), and all briefs shall be submitted by August 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/05/2019.(am) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Robert E. Dille & Rebecca Abbott Zotti for ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. Attorney Stanley A. Millan; Thomas A. Casey, Jr and Ryan Estes Johnson terminated. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/5/19. (ecm) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 , #6 Notice of Removal (Original Complaint) as to City of New Orleans answer due 8/1/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo 7/16/2019. (ecm) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by City of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laughlin, Michael) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (am). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Compliance by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC to #3 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Casey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/5/2019 to correct event(ajn). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-6195 (Fee previously paid) filed by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC.(Casey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (ajn). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC identifying corporate parent ARS International, LLC for ARS Aleut Remediation, LLC (Casey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (ajn). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent to Removal by City of New Orleans Attorney Michael J. Laughlin added to party City of New Orleans(pty:dft).(Laughlin, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DIRECTIVE by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC (clw) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-6195 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7728116) filed by ARS Aleut Remediation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Thomas A. Casey, Jr added to party ARS Aleut Remediation LLC(pty:dft).(Casey, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weston Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where New Orleans City is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suzette Peychaud Bagneris