This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2021 at 08:39:23 (UTC).

Lashley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Lashley filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Lashley

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P. Matthews

Attorney at MATTHEWS AND ASSOCIATES

2905 Sackett Street

Houston, TX 77098

William F Blankenship, III

Attorney at Blankenship Law Firm

3710 Rawlins St., Ste. 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

Richard Arthur Freese

Freese & Goss Pllc - Maple Ave., Dallas, Tx, 3500 Maple Ave., Ste. 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS - Atlanta

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Kara T. Stubbs

Attorney at BAKER STERCHI LLC - Kansas City

2400 Pershing Rd., Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

Nicole Y Silver

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP - DC

2101 L Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Parent companies: Becton, Dickinson and Company, Subsidiaries: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc., Publicly held company: Becton, Dickinson and Company,. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

13 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicole Y Silver. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8650572) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Silver, Nicole) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#9

(#9) MDL 2641 IN RE: Bard IVC Filters Products Liability Litigation Master Docket Sheet (CSG) [Clerk's Note: This transfer-in case from the USDC Arizona was not previously filed in the Eastern District of Missouri and has been opened as a EDMO new case. In addition, EDMO Clerk has been notified by the USDC Arizona Clerk that their district does not file documents in member cases, they file everything in the lead MDL action.] (Entered: 05/07/2021)(CSG) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01646. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#6

(#6) *AMENDED by Doc. #7 -- FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#3

(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21048 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/27/19. (MAP) *Modified on 4/14/2021 (MAP). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15558487 filed by Kenneth Lashley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Parent companies: Becton, Dickinson and Company, Subsidiaries: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc., Publicly held company: Becton, Dickinson and Company,. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicole Y Silver. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8650572) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Silver, Nicole) filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated ; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 05/19/2021. (CMH) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket(#14) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 5/28/2021. (CMH) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicole Y Silver. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8650572) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Silver, Nicole) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated ; ORDERED GRANTING, Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 05/12/2021. (CMH) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MDL 2641 IN RE: Bard IVC Filters Products Liability Litigation Master Docket Sheet (CSG) [Clerk's Note: This transfer-in case from the USDC Arizona was not previously filed in the Eastern District of Missouri and has been opened as a EDMO new case. In addition, EDMO Clerk has been notified by the USDC Arizona Clerk that their district does not file documents in member cases, they file everything in the lead MDL action.] (Entered: 05/07/2021)(CSG) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (CSG) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01646. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *AMENDED by Doc. #7 -- FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21048 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/27/19. (MAP) *Modified on 4/14/2021 (MAP). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-01646-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15558487 filed by Kenneth Lashley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William F Blankenship, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Arthur Freese