This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2021 at 09:49:37 (UTC).

LASHERAS v. THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 LASHERAS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04721

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Defendants

TWITTER INCORPORATED

AMAZON INCORPORATED

GOOGLE INCORPORATED

JUDGE CLAIRE C. CECCHI

QUORA INCORPORATED

LINKEDIN INCORPORATED

THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

PALANTIR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

TWITCH INCORPORATED

TESLA INCORPORATED

REDDIT INCORPORATED

JUDGE EDWARD S KIEL

VALVE SOFTWARE INCORPORATED

FACEBOOK INCORPORATED

THE ELIZABETH POLICE DEPARTMENT

NEURALINK INCORPORATED

MICROSOFT INCORPORATED

YOUTUBE INCORPORATED

PAYPAL INCORPORATED

TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

1 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

complaint

1 #2

Application IFP

1 #3

Envelope

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Denying Plaintiff's IFP application; The Clerk shall close the case; By 4/16/2021, Plaintiff may submit a new IFP application in the form attachedto this Order. Alternatively, Plaintiff may submit the $402 filing fee and the Clerk will reopen the case. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/18/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Application IFP, #3 Envelope)(jal, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELIZABETH POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where QUORA INCORPORATED is a litigant