Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 07:25:35 (UTC).

Larsen v. Bremer Financial Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 Larsen filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bremer Financial Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Hildy Bowbeer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Larsen

Defendants

Bremer Financial Corporation

Equifax Information Services LLC

Minnwest Bank

Minnesota State Colleges & Universities

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony P Chester

Attorney at Hyde & Swigart

120 S. 6Th St., Suite 2050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Robert L Hyde

Attorney at Hyde & Swigart

2221 Camino Del Rio South, Ste. 101

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph M Windler

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

225 S 6Th St Ste 3500

Mpls, MN 55402-4629

Garth G Gavenda

Attorney at Anastasi Jellum, PA

14985 N 60Th St

Stillwater, MN 55082

Lindsay W Cremona

Attorney at Anastasi Jellum, P.A.

14985 60Th Street North

Stillwater, MN 55082

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Bremer Financial Corporation by Catherine Larsen (Chester, Anthony) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Minnwest Bank. (Gavenda, Garth) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Garth G Gavenda on behalf of Minnwest Bank. (Gavenda, Garth) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bremer Financial Corporation's Time to Respond to the Complaint. Bremer Financial Corporation answer due 4/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/3/2019. (JMK) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Bremer Financial Corporation's Time to Respond to the Complaint by Bremer Financial Corporation. Jointly Signed by Catherine Larsen. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Catherine Larsen. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Chester, Anthony) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bremer Financial Corporation, Equifax Information Services LLC, Minnesota State Colleges & Universities, Minnwest Bank. (CLK) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6708466) filed by Catherine Larsen. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chester, Anthony) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Bremer Financial Corporation by Catherine Larsen (Chester, Anthony) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Minnwest Bank. (Gavenda, Garth) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Garth G Gavenda on behalf of Minnwest Bank. (Gavenda, Garth) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bremer Financial Corporation's Time to Respond to the Complaint. Bremer Financial Corporation answer due 4/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/3/2019. (JMK) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION to Extend Bremer Financial Corporation's Time to Respond to the Complaint by Bremer Financial Corporation. Jointly Signed by Catherine Larsen. (Windler, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Catherine Larsen. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Chester, Anthony) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Bremer Financial Corporation, Equifax Information Services LLC, Minnesota State Colleges & Universities, Minnwest Bank. (CLK) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schlitz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-530 PJS/HB. (CLK) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6708466) filed by Catherine Larsen. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chester, Anthony) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Minnesota State Colleges and Universities is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L Hyde

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony P Chester