Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 07:35:22 (UTC).

Larsen et al v. Speedway LLC

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Larsen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Speedway LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00897

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christopher Larsen

Sarah Larsen

Defendants

Hess Retail Stores LLC

Speedway LLC

Not Classified By Court

Stephen T. Helmer

Syracuse, NY 13202-2601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James L. Alexander

Attorney at Alexander, Catalano Law Firm - Syracuse Office

6713 Collamer Road, Suite 1

East Syracuse, NY 13057

Defendant Attorney

Brittany Lee Hannah

Attorney at Sugarman Law Firm LLP - Syracuse Office

211 West Jefferson Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Stephen T. Helmer

Attorney at Mackenzie Hughes LLP

440 South Warren Street, Suite 400

Syracuse, NY 13202-2601

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) LETTER BRIEF requesting permission for client Speedway LLC be permitted to attend mediation session via telephone by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 10/14/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/16/2019. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/26/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#13

(#13) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 10/31/2019. Discovery cutoff is 7/13/2020 (plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 4/14/2020; defendant's expert disclosures due by 5/29/2020; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 6/15/2020). Substantive motions to be filed by 9/16/2020. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/26/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#12

(#12) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#11

(#11) LETTER re #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, advising the court that Attorney Kristin L. Walker will not remain as counsel. (khr) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#6

(#11) LETTER re #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, advising the court that Attorney Kristin L. Walker will not remain as counsel. (khr) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC. (see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#3

(#3) State Court ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway LLC.(see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit(s) G - Stipulation Amending Caption

1 #6

Exhibit(s) F - Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance as to defendant Hess Retail

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Request for Supplem

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D - Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C - State Court Answer

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B - State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Index of Attached Exhibits

#1

(#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TEXT ORDER: granting #16 Letter Request. Defendant Speedway LLC's corporate representative is permitted to attend the 12/16/2019 mediation session via telephone. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/6/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) LETTER BRIEF requesting permission for client Speedway LLC be permitted to attend mediation session via telephone by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#15) STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Stephen T. Helmer, Esq. has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Brittany L. Hannah, Esq. and James L. Alexander, Esq.. Dated: September 3, 2019(Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Defense counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 10/14/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/16/2019. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/26/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 10/31/2019. Discovery cutoff is 7/13/2020 (plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 4/14/2020; defendant's expert disclosures due by 5/29/2020; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 6/15/2020). Substantive motions to be filed by 9/16/2020. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/26/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 8/26/2019 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel. Mandatory disclosures have been exchanged. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of District Judge Hurd. Counsel may submit a proposed protective order for the court's consideration. A telephonic status conference is set for 1/7/2020 at 10:30 AM. Appearances: James Alexander, Esq. for plaintiffs; Brittany Hannah, Esq. for defendant. Time: 10:01 AM - 10:10 AM. (nmk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • TEXT NOTICE: Counsel are reminded that a telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before U.S Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) LETTER re #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, advising the court that Attorney Kristin L. Walker will not remain as counsel. (khr) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Larsen.(Alexander, James) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct docket text, document is a Notice of Appearance not an Answer. (khr) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for all documents e-filed in the Northern District to date served on Kristin L. Walker, Esq., of Alexander & Catalano, LLP on July 26, 2019, filed by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Supreme Court Notice of Removal served on Kristin L. Walker, Esq. of Alexander & Catalano, LLP on July 26, 2019, filed by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiffs; Attorney Kristin L. Walker. Phone number is 315-479-8660. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Served by email on 7/25/2019}(see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/19/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC. (see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) State Court ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway LLC.(see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Onondaga County, case number 003416/2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4809145) filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Attached Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Court Answer, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance as to defendant Hess Retail Stores LLC only, #7 Exhibit(s) G - Stipulation Amending Caption, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hess Retail Stores LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPEEDWAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen T. Helmer