Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 07:22:29 (UTC).

Ronit Larone v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Ronit Larone filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00995

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronit Larone

Defendants

Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Does I through 10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig M Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Sarah Ball

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Georg Capielo

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Jack B Winters, Jr

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Alex Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic LLP

225 Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly Ryan Graf

Attorney at Dentons LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1300

Oakland, CA 94612-4709

Thomas Worger

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1300

Oakland, CA 94612-4709

Laura L Geist

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1999 Harrison Street Suite 1300

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This action has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls upon the attorneys in the action and upon the Court. All counsel, including pro se litigants, are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alex Tomasevic on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Alex Tomasevic added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Tomasevic, Alex) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Craig M Nicholas on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Craig M Nicholas added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Ball on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Sarah Ball added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Ball, Sarah) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Georg Capielo on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Georg Capielo added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Capielo, Georg) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jack B Winters, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Jack B Winters, Jr added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Winters, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Geist, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, identifying MetLife, Inc., Mercer (US) Inc., Mercer LLC, Mercer Consulting Group, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.. (Geist, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Geist, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANTS METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND MERCER HEALTH AND BENEFITS ADMINISTRATION, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS #13 AS MOOT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 15), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT, and the hearing scheduled for April 23, 2021, is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Winters, Jack) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibits A-R to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibits A-K to Declaration, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service) (Geist, Laura) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This action has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls upon the attorneys in the action and upon the Court. All counsel, including pro se litigants, are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alex Tomasevic on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Alex Tomasevic added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Tomasevic, Alex) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Craig M Nicholas on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Craig M Nicholas added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Inclusive, Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ronit Larone. Filed in State Court on 11/23/2020 Submitted with Exhibit A Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Ball on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Sarah Ball added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Ball, Sarah) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Georg Capielo on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Georg Capielo added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Capielo, Georg) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jack B Winters, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Ronit Larone (Attorney Jack B Winters, Jr added to party Ronit Larone(pty:pla))(Winters, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Geist, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, identifying MetLife, Inc., Mercer (US) Inc., Mercer LLC, Mercer Consulting Group, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.. (Geist, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Geist, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20-STCV-45014 Receipt No: ACACDC-30399252 - Fee: $402, filed by defendants Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Summons and Complaint, #2 Exh B - Mercer Health and Benefits Administration Summons and Complaint, #3 Exh C, #4 Exh D) (Attorney Laura L Geist added to party Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Laura L Geist added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Geist, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Ball