This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:53:52 (UTC).

Larive v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Larive filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey L. Viken and Daneta Wollmann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05043

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

Referral Judge

Daneta Wollmann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Eugene Larive, Jr.

Springfield, MO 65801-4000

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Kevin Koliner

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Stephanie C. Bengford

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638, 357.2341, Fax: 330.4402

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) LETTER Received from James Larive Jr. (SLW) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#2

(#2) New Case LETTER with enclosed Docket Sheet sent by Clerk's Office to James Eugene Larive, Jr. (CLR) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 13-50100. filed by James Eugene Larive, Jr. (CLR) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER Received from James Larive Jr. (SLW) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case LETTER with enclosed Docket Sheet sent by Clerk's Office to James Eugene Larive, Jr. (CLR) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 13-50100. filed by James Eugene Larive, Jr. (CLR) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less