This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2022 at 08:53:23 (UTC).

LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD. v. FISCH SIGLER, LLP

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 LARGAN PRECISION CO , LTD filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against FISCH SIGLER, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Trevor N. McFadden. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-MC-00049

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Trevor N. McFadden

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.

Respondent

FISCH SIGLER, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Thomas B. Mason

Charles Thomas Kimmett, Jr.

Respondent Attorneys

Alan M. Fisch

Jeffrey M. Saltman

R. William Sigler

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting Largan's #1 Motion to Stay Arbitration; ordering that the Statement of Claim submitted to the D.C. Bar Attorney/ClientArbitration Board by Fisch Sigler is quashed; and ordering that the arbitration instituted by Fisch Sigler against Largan is permanently stayed. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Largan's #1 Motion to Stay Arbitration. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Thomas Kimmett, Jr on behalf of LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD. (Kimmett, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

9 #6

Text of Proposed Order

9 #5

Exhibit D - 2021-10-20 Letter to ACAB re Largan Precision Co

9 #4

Exhibit C - June 6 Email Chain

9 #3

Exhibit B - C. Wen Lee NY Bar Profile

9 #2

Exhibit A - 2021-12-16 FS Letter to ACAB re Largan

9 #1

Declaration of R. Sigler

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FISCH SIGLER, LLP (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Saltman on behalf of FISCH SIGLER, LLP (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by R. William Sigler on behalf of FISCH SIGLER, LLP (Sigler, R.) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting Largan's #1 Motion to Stay Arbitration; ordering that the Statement of Claim submitted to the D.C. Bar Attorney/ClientArbitration Board by Fisch Sigler is quashed; and ordering that the arbitration instituted by Fisch Sigler against Largan is permanently stayed. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Largan's #1 Motion to Stay Arbitration. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to opposition to motion re #1 MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kimmett, Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 6/6/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Thomas Kimmett, Jr on behalf of LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD. (Kimmett, Charles) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum in opposition to re #1 MOTION to Stay filed by FISCH SIGLER, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Sigler, #2 Exhibit A - 2021-12-16 FS Letter to ACAB re Largan, #3 Exhibit B - C. Wen Lee NY Bar Profile, #4 Exhibit C - June 6 Email Chain, #5 Exhibit D - 2021-10-20 Letter to ACAB re Largan Precision Co, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Saltman, Jeffrey) Modified docket event/text on 5/27/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FISCH SIGLER, LLP (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Saltman on behalf of FISCH SIGLER, LLP (Saltman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by R. William Sigler on behalf of FISCH SIGLER, LLP (Sigler, R.) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan M. Fisch on behalf of FISCH SIGLER, LLP (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD. (Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/16/22. (lctnm2) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FISCH SIGLER, LLP. (zeg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2022: #1 Notice and Consent) (zeg). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Stay Arbitration by LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits)(zeg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less