This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 09:02:43 (UTC).

Larcom v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Larcom filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George A. OToole, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10451

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George A. OToole, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Larcom

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

Tormax Technologies

Dayton Hudson Corporation

Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.

Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry A. Feinstein

Attorney at Law Offices of Barry Feinstein & Affiliates P.C.

100 Lowell Street, Po Box 6049

Peabody, MA 01961

John J. Regan

Attorney at Dolan & Regan

7 Essex Green Drive

Peabody, MA 01960

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan F. Tabasky

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg LLP

125 High Street, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

Jessica L. Naegely

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

125 High Street, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

Christopher G. Betke

Attorney at Coughlin & Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Elizabeth A. Doubleday

Attorney at Coughlin Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Matthew R. Manuszak

Attorney at Coughlin Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A., State Court Record

#9

#8

#7

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Category Form

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Naegely on behalf of Tormax Technologies (Naegely, Jessica) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#17) Remark- The scheduling set for 6/17/21 at 12 will be held by telephone. The call in number is 888-675-2535; Access Code: 6770248. Please follow the prompts. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2021 12:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Crossclaim , Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Doubleday, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jane Larcom (Regan, John) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Tormax USA Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim and Affirmative Defenses to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.'s Cross-Claim by Tormax Technologies.(Tabasky, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Tormax USA Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM of Tormax USA Inc. against Dayton Hudson Corporation, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. by Tormax Technologies.(Tabasky, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Tabasky on behalf of Tormax Technologies (Tabasky, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Regan on behalf of Jane Larcom (Regan, John) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., State Court Record)(Doubleday, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Doubleday, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand in response to Plaintiff's Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Tormax Technologies by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Doubleday, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#6) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Manuszak on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Manuszak, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Betke on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Doubleday on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Doubleday, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8682527 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Category Form)(Doubleday, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2021: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Currie, Haley). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORMAX TECHNOLOGIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dayton-Hudson Corp #333 is a litigant

Latest cases where Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant