This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2022 at 21:01:09 (UTC).

Larball Publishing Company, Inc. et al v. Lipa et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Larball Publishing Company, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Lipa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01872

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Larball Publishing Company, Inc.

Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc.

Defendants

Dua Lipa

Jonathan Lyndale Kirk ("Da Baby") doing business as Baby Jesus Publishing

Bosco Kante

Clarence Coffee Jr.

Sarah Hudson

Stephen Kozmeniuk

EMI Music Publishing Ltd.

Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC

Universal Music Corporation

Warner Music Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Y Lin

Attorney at Brown,LLC

111 Town Square Place, Suite 400

Jersey City, NJ 07310

Patrick Sidney Almonrode

Attorney at Brown, LLC

111 Town Square Place, Suite 400

Jersey City, NJ 07310

Jason Travis Brown

Attorney at Brown, LLC

111 Town Square Place, Suite 400

Jersey City, NJ 07310

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey M. Movit

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP (NY)

437 Madison Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

29 #5

Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission

29 #4

Supplement CO COGS

29 #3

Supplement CA COGS

29 #2

Supplement NJ COGS

29 #1

Affidavit Affidavit

29 #29

Main Document

28 #3

Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission

28 #2

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

28 #1

Affidavit Affidavit

28 #28

Main Document

#27

(#27) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bosco Kante served on 6/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Co-resident. Document filed by Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc.; Larball Publishing Company, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M. Movit on behalf of Clarence Coffee Jr., Sarah Hudson, Stephen Kozmeniuk, Dua Lipa, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Warner Music Corp...(Movit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#25

(#25) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC..(lal) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#5

(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Larball Publishing Company, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#1

(#22) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to EMI MUSIC PUBLISHING LTD. C/O THE PRENTICE-HALL CORPORATION SYSTEM, INC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Larball Publishing Company, Inc., Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #29 MOTION for Benjamin Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California 415-865-7000; expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of New Jersey; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Benjamin Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Larball Publishing Company, Inc., Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement NJ COGS, #3 Supplement CA COGS, #4 Supplement CO COGS, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission).(Lin, Benjamin) Modified on 8/1/2022 (sgz). (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #28 MOTION for Benjamin Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26449937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California and Colorado; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Benjamin Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26449937. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Larball Publishing Company, Inc., Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission).(Lin, Benjamin) Modified on 7/25/2022 (sgz). (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bosco Kante served on 6/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Co-resident. Document filed by Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc.; Larball Publishing Company, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey M. Movit on behalf of Clarence Coffee Jr., Sarah Hudson, Stephen Kozmeniuk, Dua Lipa, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Warner Music Corp...(Movit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC..(lal) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to EMI Music Publishing Ltd...(lal) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to SONY MUSIC PUBLISHING (US) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Larball Publishing Company, Inc., Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to EMI MUSIC PUBLISHING LTD. C/O THE PRENTICE-HALL CORPORATION SYSTEM, INC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Larball Publishing Company, Inc., Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason Travis Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason Travis Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Clarence Coffee Jr., EMI Music Publishing Ltd., Sarah Hudson, Bosco Kante, Jonathan Lyndale Kirk, Stephen Kozmeniuk, Dua Lipa, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Warner Music Corp, Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc., Larball Publishing Company, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Larball Publishing Company, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Clarence Coffee Jr., EMI Music Publishing Ltd., Sarah Hudson, Bosco Kante, Jonathan Lyndale Kirk, Stephen Kozmeniuk, Dua Lipa, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Universal Music Corporation, Warner Music Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25817249)Document filed by Sandy Linzer Productions, Inc., Larball Publishing Company, Inc...(Brown, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Music Publishing Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant