This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2022 at 08:16:12 (UTC).

Andres Lara v. Wholesale Screening Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Andres Lara filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wholesale Screening Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09672

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andres Lara

Defendant

Wholesale Screening Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie R. Tatar

Attorney at Tatar Law Firm APC

3500 West Olive Avenue Suite 300

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32478422 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara. (Attorney Stephanie R. Tatar added to party Andres Lara(pty:pla))(Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara, (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (vv) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wholesale Screening Solutions, LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara, (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32478422 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Andres Lara. (Attorney Stephanie R. Tatar added to party Andres Lara(pty:pla))(Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie R Tatar