This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:11:28 (UTC).

Laplante v. C R Bard Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Laplante filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry Edward Autrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01087

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry Edward Autrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert LaPlante

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

C R Bard Inc

Does 1 through 100 inclusive

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven S. Schulte

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Eric M. Przybysz

Attorney at SIMON GREENSTONE PC

1201 Elm St., Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Darren Patrick McDowell

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Junek

Attorney at HARTLINE BARGER LLP - Dallas

8750 N. Central Expy., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at HARTLINE BARGER LLP - Dallas

8750 N. Central Expy., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Jordan E Jarreau

Attorney at HARTLINE BARGER LLP - Dallas

8750 N. Central Expy., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Nicole Y Silver

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP - DC

2101 L Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20037

Kara T. Stubbs

Attorney at BAKER STERCHI LLC - Kansas City

2400 Pershing Rd., Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

 

Court Documents

#36

#31

#29

#28

#27

#26

#8

#2

1 #14

Exhibit(s) D-8 Executed Return of Service- C.R. Bard Inc.

1 #13

Exhibit(s) D-7 Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson

1 #12

Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued - McKesson

1 #7

Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition

1 #4

Exhibit(s) B - McKesson

1 #3

Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #36 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. ; GRANTED. MATTER IS STAYED UNTIL FEBRUARY 23, 2021. PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 23, 2021. SO ORDERED. ( Status Report due by 2/23/2021.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on September 1, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Docket Text ORDER: #31 STIPULATION for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. ; SO ORDERED. McKesson Corporation terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on August 31, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) filed by McKesson Corporation, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. ; DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on August 31, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #29 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney in Replacement of Dkt. 28 Motion to Withdraw ;attorney/firm Melissa Dorman Matthews by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/28/2020. (AAT) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Melissa Dorman Matthews by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. ; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/28/2020. (AAT) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jordan E. Jarreau by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Jessica Junek by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) filed by McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED., ( Attorney Jordan E Jarreau and Jessica Junek terminated.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/28/2020. (AAT) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney in Replacement of Dkt. 28 Motion to Withdraw ;attorney/firm Melissa Dorman Matthews by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Melissa Dorman Matthews by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/16/2020) (dsr). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/9/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900275) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 Executed Return of Service- C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Y Silver