This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:34:36 (UTC).

Lapke et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Lapke filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brenna Lapke

Matthew Lapke

Defendants

John Does 1-5

ABC Companies 1-3

Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Channing Hartelius

Attorney at HARTELIUS DUROCHER WINTER

P.O. Box 1629

Great Falls, MT 59403

Defendant Attorney

Bradley J. Luck

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: The parties have #8 jointly moved to vacate the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, June 26, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. and the deadlines in the Court's May 8, 2019 #4 Order are VACATED to allow the parties to continue gathering records necessary for complete evaluation of the claims and potential resolution. The parties will file a joint status report with the court on or before July 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/12/2019. (ACC) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, and Associated Deadlines Bradley J. Luck appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Luck, Bradley) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John Johnston (ACC) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#6

(#6) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (ACC) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/19/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/19/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/19/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/8/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John T. Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Channing Hartelius, Bradley J. Luck. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/28/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D - Insurance Commissioner Letter

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, Case Number CDV-19-0200. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Insurance Commissioner Letter) (MMS) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: The parties have #8 jointly moved to vacate the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, June 26, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. and the deadlines in the Court's May 8, 2019 #4 Order are VACATED to allow the parties to continue gathering records necessary for complete evaluation of the claims and potential resolution. The parties will file a joint status report with the court on or before July 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/12/2019. (ACC) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION to Vacate #4 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, and Associated Deadlines Bradley J. Luck appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Luck, Bradley) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John Johnston (ACC) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (ACC) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/19/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/19/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/19/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/8/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Luck, Bradley) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John T. Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Channing Hartelius, Bradley J. Luck. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 5/28/2019. (MMS) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2306152 (MMS) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, Case Number CDV-19-0200. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Insurance Commissioner Letter) (MMS) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less