This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2022 at 09:00:14 (UTC).

LaPine #305535 v. Lincoln et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 LaPine 305535 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Lincoln. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Phillip J. Green. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00675

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darrin LaPine #305535

Brimley, MI 49715

Defendants

Robert Lincoln

Unknown Traylor

Unknown Ball

Unknown Desjarden

Unknown Turvo

Unknown Hoppes

Unknown Reed

Unknown Williams

D. Hall

Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1

Unknown Kerr

Unknown Part(y)(ies) #3

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alicia Lane

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (MDOC)

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Joseph Ho

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (MDOC)

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Theodore W. Seitz

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC (Lansing)

Capitol View Bldg., 201 Townsend St., Ste. 900

Lansing, MI 48933

 

Court Documents

#48

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#3

(#7) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re #4 , #3 by plaintiff Darrin LaPine #305535 (ns) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#57

(#57) BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION to stay TO STAY PROCEEDINGS FOR 21 DAYS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #56 WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Unknown Ball, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#56

(#56) UNOPPOSED MOTION to stay TO STAY PROCEEDINGS FOR 21 DAYS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Ball, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams; (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#55

(#55) ORDER dismissing #52 motion for order ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#54

(#54) MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of status conference (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

53 #1

Exhibit 1: Rittner v. Kinder, 290 F. App'x 796, 797 (6th Cir. Aug. 20, 2008

#53

(#53) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss MOTION for order REVOKE IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #52 filed by Unknown Ball, Unknown Desjarden, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Rittner v. Kinder, 290 F. App'x 796, 797 (6th Cir. Aug. 20, 2008)) (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#52

(#52) MOTION to dismiss ( responses due 9/30/2022;), MOTION for order REVOKE IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Ball, Unknown Desjarden, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams; (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#51

(#51) (DISREGARD) ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #7 filed granting appellant's motion to voluntary dismiss the case ; no mandate to issue (ns) Modified text on 7/28/2022; entered in wrong case (ns). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#50

(#50) NOTICE OF SEVERED CASE (ns) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#49

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#46

No Description Available

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION to stay TO STAY PROCEEDINGS FOR 21 DAYS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #56 WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Unknown Ball, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) UNOPPOSED MOTION to stay TO STAY PROCEEDINGS FOR 21 DAYS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Ball, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams; (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order on Motion for Order #55 sent via U.S. Mail to Darrin LaPine #305535 (mg) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER dismissing #52 motion for order ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of status conference (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (ald) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss MOTION for order REVOKE IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE #52 filed by Unknown Ball, Unknown Desjarden, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Rittner v. Kinder, 290 F. App'x 796, 797 (6th Cir. Aug. 20, 2008)) (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION to dismiss ( responses due 9/30/2022;), MOTION for order REVOKE IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS WITH A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Ball, Unknown Desjarden, D. Hall, Unknown Hoppes, Unknown Reed, Unknown Traylor, Unknown Turvo, Unknown Williams; (Ho, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) (DISREGARD) ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #7 filed granting appellant's motion to voluntary dismiss the case ; no mandate to issue (ns) Modified text on 7/28/2022; entered in wrong case (ns). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Notice #50 sent via U.S. Mail to Darrin LaPine #305535 (ns) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF SEVERED CASE (ns) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE NUMBER 19-1403 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #7 (mkc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Notice of Interlocutory Appeal #7 with a docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Darrin LaPine #305535 (ns) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re #4 , #3 by plaintiff Darrin LaPine #305535 (ns) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Darrin LaPine #305535 to Saginaw Correctional Facility (ns) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for reconsideration re #4 by plaintiff Darrin LaPine #305535; (ns) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #4 , Opinion (Screening) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Darrin LaPine #305535 (ns) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $400.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ns) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Darrin LaPine #305535 (ns) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore W. Seitz